EP1116849 - Driving assembly for swingable parts on vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoerbiger Automotive Komfortsysteme GmbH Martina-Hörbiger-Strasse 5 86956 Schongau / DE | [2011/23] |
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states Hoerbiger Automatisierungstechnik Holding GmbH Martina-Hörbiger-Strasse 5 86956 Schongau / DE | ||
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states Hoerbiger Automatisierungstechnik Holding GmbH Südliche Römerstrasse 15 86972 Altenstadt / DE | ||
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states Hoerbiger Hydraulik GmbH Martina-Hörbiger-Strasse 5 86956 Schongau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stolle, Klaus Ulmenweg 6 86972 Schwabniederhofen / DE | 02 /
Kladiwa, Wolfgang Grasleitner Strasse 2 82386 Huglfing / DE | 03 /
Hollerbach, Anton Beethovenstrasse 19 86956 Schongau / DE | 04 /
Hollberbach, Bernhard Dorfstrasse 28 86989 Steingaden / DE | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | Grättinger & Partner (GbR) Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | ||
Former [2001/29] | Laminger, Norbert, Mag., et al Patentanwälte Klein, Pinter & Laminger OEG Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 00890347.8 | 22.11.2000 | [2001/29] | Priority number, date | AT20000000060 | 14.01.2000 Original published format: AT 602000 | [2001/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1116849 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1116849 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1116849 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/04, B62D25/12 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
F15B15/065 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/50 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/546 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [2006/36] |
Former [2001/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Betätigungsanordnung für Schwenkbare Teile an Fahrzeugen | [2001/29] | English: | Driving assembly for swingable parts on vehicles | [2001/29] | French: | Système d'actionnement pour pièces pivotantes sur des véhicules | [2001/29] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 05.07.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.10.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, TR | 04.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.08.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   21.12.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 27.07.2011 | FR | 30.11.2011 | [2013/04] |
Former [2012/10] | SE | 27.07.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US1957697 (CONWAY JOHN W) [X] 1-3,6-11 * page 1, line 8 - page 2, line 87; figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 12-15; | [X]FR1409555 (MAGNETI MARELLI SPA) [X] 1-5* the whole document *; | [XA]US4489640 (OLSON PAUL E [US]) [X] 1-3,6-14 * column 1, lines 5-64 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 48; figures 1a,1b; claim 1 * [A] 4,5,15,16; | [X]US5228239 (HEO CHANG I [KR]) [X] 1-5,16 * column 1, lines 6-18 * * column 3, line 66 - column 9, line 2; figures 1-6; claim 1 *; | [X]US5467596 (YU XUDONG [US]) [X] 1-5,15 * column 2, line 55 - column 7, line 6; figures 1-7; claim 1 * | Examination | DE1291222 | by applicant | US1957697 | DE1291222 | US4489640 |