EP1140646 - HINGED CLOSURE WITH TAMPERPROOF ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terxo AG Kastellstrasse 1 8623 Wetzikon-Kempten / CH | [2001/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUBACH, Werner, Fritz Im Hubrain 4 CH-8124 Maur / CH | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Keller Schneider Patent- und Markenanwälte AG (Zürich) Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Patentanwälte Feldmann & Partner AG Kanalstrasse 17 8152 Glattbrugg / CH | Application number, filing date | 00900014.2 | 04.01.2000 | [2001/41] | WO2000CH00006 | Priority number, date | CH19990000060 | 14.01.1999 Original published format: CH 6099 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0041943 | Date: | 20.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1140646 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1140646 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/08, B65D55/08 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
B65D47/0804 (EP);
B65D55/0818 (EP);
B65D2401/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Title | German: | SCHARNIERVERSCHLUSS MIT GARANTIEELEMENT | [2001/41] | English: | HINGED CLOSURE WITH TAMPERPROOF ELEMENT | [2001/41] | French: | FERMETURE A CHARNIERE A ELEMENT D'INVIOLABILITE | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 16.07.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 19.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.11.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 24.04.2002 | FR | 24.04.2002 | GR | 24.04.2002 | IE | 24.04.2002 | IT | 24.04.2002 | NL | 24.04.2002 | DK | 24.07.2002 | PT | 24.07.2002 | SE | 24.07.2002 | ES | 30.10.2002 | CY | 04.01.2003 | LU | 04.01.2003 | [2007/35] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 24.04.2002 | |
FR | 24.04.2002 | ||
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
IE | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
CY | 04.01.2003 | ||
LU | 04.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | FI | 24.04.2002 | |
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
IE | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
CY | 04.01.2003 | ||
LU | 04.01.2003 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 24.04.2002 | |
GR | 24.04.2002 | ||
IE | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
LU | 04.01.2003 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | GR | 24.04.2002 | |
IE | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
LU | 04.01.2003 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | GR | 24.04.2002 | |
IE | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
ES | 30.10.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | GR | 24.04.2002 | |
IE | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
FR | 10.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/45] | GR | 24.04.2002 | |
IE | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
DK | 24.07.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | GR | 24.04.2002 | |
IE | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
PT | 24.07.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | GR | 24.04.2002 | |
IE | 24.04.2002 | ||
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | IE | 24.04.2002 | |
NL | 24.04.2002 | ||
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/07] | NL | 24.04.2002 | |
SE | 24.07.2002 | ||
Former [2002/42] | SE | 24.07.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4485932 (KUSZ MAXIMILLIAN [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 3 - line 43; figures 1-12 *; | [AD]US4487324 (OSTROWSKY EFREM M [US]) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 38; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US5356018 (DUBACH WERNER F [CH]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 57; figures 1-8 *; | [AD]US5392938 (DUBACH WERNER F [CH]) [AD] 1 * column 2, line 55 - line 66; figures 1-10 *; | [AD]US5829610 (ROHR ROBERT D [US], et al) [AD] 1* column 9, line 36 - line 64; figures 1-23; claim 1 * | by applicant | US4487324 | US4696408 | EP0210138 | EP0537324 | US5392938 | US5497906 | US5829610 |