EP1141692 - CORRECTING PROTEIN INDUCED ERROR IN PH-SENSITIVE ISE COMPRISING A POLYMERIC MEMBRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER CORPORATION 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US | [2006/14] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENCO, John, S. 85 Regal Street Holliston, MA 01746 / US | 02 /
KROUWER, Jan, S. 26 Parks Drive Sherborn, MA 01770 / US | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Burkert, Frank, et al Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Law and Patents Patents and Licensing Building Q 18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Burkert, Frank, et al Bayer AG, Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00900029.0 | 07.01.2000 | [2001/41] | WO2000IB00018 | Priority number, date | US19990115039P | 07.01.1999 Original published format: US 115039 P | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0040956 | Date: | 13.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1141692 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1141692 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/416, G01N33/84, G01N33/49 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
G01N27/4167 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KORREKTUR DES PROTEININDUZIERTEN FEHLERS IN PH-SENSITIVER ISE MIT POLYMERMEMBRAN | [2001/41] | English: | CORRECTING PROTEIN INDUCED ERROR IN PH-SENSITIVE ISE COMPRISING A POLYMERIC MEMBRANE | [2001/41] | French: | CORRECTION DE L'ERREUR DUE AUX PROTEINES DANS LES ELECTRODES A MEMBRANE SELECTIVE SENSIBLES AU PH COMPORTANT UNE MEMBRANE POLYMERE | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 12.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/11] | Request for further processing for: | 10.08.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 10.08.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.08.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 06.07.2006 | AT | 07.01.2007 | CY | 07.01.2007 | FI | 07.01.2007 | LU | 07.01.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/29] | GR | 06.07.2006 | |
AT | 07.01.2007 | ||
CY | 07.01.2007 | ||
FI | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | GR | 06.07.2006 | |
CY | 07.01.2007 | ||
FI | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | GR | 06.07.2006 | |
FI | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 07.01.2007 | |
Former [2007/48] | IT | 05.04.2006 | |
FI | 07.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | IT | 05.04.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0362032 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 37 - line 40 * * page 5, line 12 - line 24 * * page 8, line 50 - line 59; figures 6A,6B *; | [A]EP0364948 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * table 2 *; | [X]DE4025426 (FRESENIUS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 50 * * column 5, line 46 - line 48 *; | [DA]US5554272 (BENCO JOHN S [US], et al) [DA] 4-17 * column 1, line 5 - line 8 ** column 5, line 45 - column 7, line 14 *; | [A]WO9838503 (KONE INSTR OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,4-17 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 2 * * page 10, line 22 - line 26 *; | [A] - OESCH U ET AL, "ION-SELECTIVE MEMBRANE ELECTRODES FOR CLINICAL USE", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY. WINSTON, (19860801), vol. 32, no. 8, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 1448 - 1459, XP000616341 [A] 1-17 * abstract * * page 1452, chapter "H+-selective Electrodes" pages 1453,1454, chapters "HCO3--selective Electrodes" and "Influence of Protein and Lipid Volume" * |