EP1201547 - HEATER WIRE FOR DEVICE SUCH AS IMPULSE HEAT SEALER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sakamoto, Atsunobu 10-15, Minamiyama 3-chome Shiroimachi Inba-gun Chiba 270-1423 / JP | For all designated states Sakamoto, Kazuko 10-15 Minamiyama 3-chome Shiroimachi Inba-gun Chiba 270-1423 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states Sakamoto, Atsunobo 10-15, Minamiyama 3-chome, Shiroimachi Inba-gun, Chiba 270-1423 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sakamoto, Kazuko 10-15 Minamiyama 3-chome, Shiroimachi Inba-gun, Chiba 270-1423 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | Thomson, Paul Anthony, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | ||
Former [2002/18] | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00900137.1 | 07.01.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000JP00035 | Priority number, date | JP19990199410 | 09.06.1999 Original published format: JP 19941099 | [2002/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0075018 | Date: | 14.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1201547 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.12.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65B51/10, H05B3/12, B29C65/22, // B29C65/38 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
B29C65/222 (EP,US);
B65B51/10 (KR);
B29C65/228 (EP,US);
B29C65/229 (EP,US);
B29C66/0044 (EP,US);
B29C66/223 (EP,US);
B29C66/225 (EP,US);
B29C66/244 (EP,US);
B29C66/246 (EP,US);
B29C66/80 (EP,US);
B29C66/81871 (EP,US);
H05B3/54 (EP,US);
B29C65/38 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/8122 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/8122, B29K2909/08 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/8122, B29K2827/12 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/18] | B65B51/10, H05B3/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/18] | Title | German: | HEIZDRAHT FÜR GERÄTE WIE IMPULS-HEISSIEGELVORRICHTUNGEN | [2002/18] | English: | HEATER WIRE FOR DEVICE SUCH AS IMPULSE HEAT SEALER | [2002/18] | French: | FIL CHAUFFANT POUR DISPOSITIFS TELS QUE DES THERMOSCELLEURS A IMPULSIONS | [2002/18] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2001 | Translation filed | 21.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 21.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 15.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/04] | 05.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR1476741 (BERNHARDT & CO ETS) [X] 1,6 * figures 1-8; claim 1 *[A] 4,5,9,10; | [XA]DE3344561 (DOERSTE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6 * figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 4,5,9,10; | [XA]US4647756 (WILLIS FRANK M [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * figure 1 * [A] 4 | International search | [Y]JPS57167004U ; | [Y]JPH10186911 (CANON KK) |