EP1142481 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FERMENTED MILK CONTAINING ANGIOTENSIN CONVERTING ENZYME INHIBITORY PEPTIDE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING MILK SERUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calpis Co., Ltd. 4-1, Ebisu-Minami 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0022 / JP | [2009/36] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Calpis Co., Ltd. 4-1, Ebisu-Minami 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0022 / JP | ||
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Calpis Co., Ltd. 4-1, Ebisu-Minami 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 150-0022 / JP | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Calpis Co., Ltd. 20-3, Ebisu-Nishi 2-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 150-0021 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAMURA, Shuji 426-1-309,Shibokuchi,Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0023 / JP | 02 /
UEYAMA, Takashi 5-6-106-205,Chuou,Souja-shi Okayama 719-1131 / JP | [2005/28] |
Former [2001/41] | 01 /
KITAMURA, Shuji Raionzugaden Musashinakahara 309 426-1, Shibokuchi Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0023 / JP | ||
02 /
UEYAMA, Takashi Gureshia Koizumi 2-302 6-14-6, Minamikasai Edogawa-ku Tokyo 134-0085 / JP | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00900164.5 | 11.01.2000 | [2001/41] | WO2000JP00068 | Priority number, date | JP19990003946 | 11.01.1999 Original published format: JP 394699 | [2001/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0041572 | Date: | 20.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1142481 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1142481 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1142481 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.07.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/123, A23C20/02, A23C11/10, A23C21/02 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
A23C21/026 (EP,US);
A23C19/045 (EP,US);
A23C19/05 (EP,US);
A23C21/00 (EP,US);
A23C9/123 (EP,US);
A23C9/1234 (EP,US);
A23L33/18 (EP,US);
A23C2260/05 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US);
A23V2400/147 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/326, A23V2250/5424 (US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/326, A23V2250/5424, A23V2400/147 (EP) |
Former IPC [2001/41] | A23C9/123, A23C20/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SAUERMILCH ENTHALTEND EIN INHIBITIONSPEPTID FUER EIN ANGIOTENSIN KONVERTIERENDES ENZYM SOWIE EIN VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MILCHSERUM | [2001/41] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FERMENTED MILK CONTAINING ANGIOTENSIN CONVERTING ENZYME INHIBITORY PEPTIDE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING MILK SERUM | [2001/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE LAIT FERMENTE RENFERMANT UN PEPTIDE INHIBITEUR DE L'ENZYME DE CONVERSION DE L'ANGIOTENSINE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE LACTOSERUM | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2001 | Translation filed | 12.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2001 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 12.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 01.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2006 | Observations by third parties | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.06.2006
06.07.2006
ADMISSIBLE Friesland Brands B.V. Blankenstein 142 7943 PE Meppel / NL Opponent's representative van Loon, C.J.J., et al, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | 02
29.06.2006
12.09.2006
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED VALIO OY Meijeritie 6 00370 Helsinki / FI Opponent's representative Lax, Monica Ingeborg Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.06.2006
06.07.2006
ADMISSIBLE Friesland Brands B.V. Blankenstein 142 7943 PE Meppel / NL Opponent's representative van Loon, C.J.J., et al, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
02
29.06.2006
12.09.2006
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED VALIO OY Meijeritie 6 00370 Helsinki / FI Opponent's representative Lax, Monica Ingeborg Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | |||
Former [2006/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.06.2006
06.07.2006
ADMISSIBLE Friesland Brands B.V. Blankenstein 142 7943 PE Meppel / NL Opponent's representative van Loon, C.J.J., et al, et al c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR The Hague / NL | ||
02
29.06.2006
12.09.2006
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED VALIO OY Meijeritie 6 00370 Helsinki / FI Opponent's representative Lax, Monica Ingeborg Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | |||
Former [2006/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.06.2006
Friesland Brands B.V. Blankenstein 142 7943 PE Meppel / NL Opponent's representative van Loon, C.J.J., et al, et al c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR The Hague / NL | ||
02
29.06.2006
DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED VALIO OY Meijeritie 6 00370 Helsinki / FI Opponent's representative Lax, Monica Ingeborg Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | 04.07.2006 | No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 06.07.2006 | No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 12.07.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Opposition is deemed not to be filed 02 | 15.09.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.09.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular right | 22.06.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.06.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.06.2008 | 17.06.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 26.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 21.01.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 31.01.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 21.07.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.09.2005 | BE | 28.09.2005 | CY | 28.09.2005 | GR | 28.12.2005 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 28.09.2005 | |
BE | 28.09.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 28.09.2005 | |
BE | 28.09.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 28.09.2005 | |
BE | 28.09.2005 | ||
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 28.09.2005 | |
GR | 28.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | GR | 28.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06197786 ; | [A]EP0699689 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1 * example 3 *; | [AP]WO9916862 (CALPIS CO LTD [JP], et al) [AP] 1-9* abstract *; | [A] - YMAMOTO N ET AL, "Antihypertensive effects of different kinds of fermented milk in spontaneously hypertensive rats", BIOSCIENCE BIOTECHNOLOGY BIOCHEMISTRY, JAPAN SOC. FOR BIOSCIENCE, BIOTECHNOLOGY AND AGROCHEM. TOKYO, JP, (1994), vol. 58, no. 4, ISSN 0916-8451, pages 776 - 778, XP002095348 [A] 1-5,7-9 * the whole document * | [A] - NAOYUKI YAMAMOTO, "Antihypertensive effect of the peptides derived from casein by an extracellular proteinase from Lactobacillus helveticus CP790", JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE, CHAPAIGN, ILLINOIS US, (1994), vol. 77, pages 917 - 922, XP002236189 [A] 1-5,7-9 * page 918 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3168/jds.S0022-0302(94)77026-0 | [A] - TAKANO T, "Milk derived peptides and hypertension reduction.", INTERNATIONAL DAIRY JOURNAL 8 (5/6) 375-381 1998 RES. & DEV. CENT., CALPIS CO. LTD., 5-11-10 FUCHINOBE, SAGAMIHARA, KANAGAWA 229, JAPAN, XP002236259 [A] 1-9 * page 376 - page 378, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-6946(98)00060-0 | [A] - YASUNORI NAKAMURA, "Purification aqnd charcaterisation of angiotensin I-converting enzyme inhibitors from sour milk", JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE, CHAPAIGN, ILLINOIS US, (1995), vol. 78, pages 777 - 783, XP002236190 [A] 1-9 * page 778 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3168/jds.S0022-0302(95)76689-9 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 33, Database accession no. 1994-268691, XP002236191 & JPH06197786 A 19940719 (CALPIS SHOKUHIN KOGYO KK) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH03120225 (AJINOMOTO KK); | [Y]EP0583074 (CALPIS FOOD IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JPH0775521 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) |