EP1159358 - PRINTING INKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Imaging Colorants Limited P.O. Box 42 Hexagon Tower Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [2006/16] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Avecia Inkjet Limited P.O. Box 42, Hexagon Tower Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | ||
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Avecia Limited Hexagon House Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTHWELL, Geoffrey Richard P.O. Box 42, Hexagon House Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | 02 /
THETFORD, Dean Hexagon House, P.O. Box 42 Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Mayall, John, et al Fujifilm Imaging Colorants Limited Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 42 Hexagon Tower, Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | Mayall, John, et al Fujifilm Imaging Colorants Limited Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 42 Hexagon Tower Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | ||
Former [2004/17] | Mayall, John Avecia Limited Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 42 Hexagon House Blackley Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | ||
Former [2001/49] | Fawkes, David Melville Avecia Limited Intellectual Property Group, P.O. Box 42, Hexagon House Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00900261.9 | 12.01.2000 | [2001/49] | WO2000GB00060 | Priority number, date | GB19990002386 | 04.02.1999 Original published format: GB 9902386 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0046313 | Date: | 10.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1159358 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1159358 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
C09D11/326 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/49] | Title | German: | DRUCKFARBEN | [2001/49] | English: | PRINTING INKS | [2001/49] | French: | ENCRES D'IMPRESSION | [2001/49] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 22.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.12.2005 | BE | 28.12.2005 | CH | 28.12.2005 | CY | 28.12.2005 | FI | 28.12.2005 | FR | 28.12.2005 | IT | 28.12.2005 | LI | 28.12.2005 | NL | 28.12.2005 | IE | 12.01.2006 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | DK | 28.03.2006 | GR | 28.03.2006 | SE | 28.03.2006 | ES | 08.04.2006 | PT | 29.05.2006 | DE | 01.08.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/52] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
FR | 28.12.2005 | ||
IT | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 12.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
DE | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
IT | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 12.01.2006 | ||
FR | 31.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
DE | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
IT | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 12.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
DE | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 12.01.2006 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
DE | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 12.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
DE | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
IE | 12.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 28.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS624433 ; | [XD]GB2001083 (ICI LTD) [XD] 1-8,10,14,16 * page 2, lines 51,52; example 23 *; | [YD]WO9715633 (XAAR LTD [GB], et al) [YD] 12,13 * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 7 *; | [XY]US5837046 (SCHOFIELD JOHN DAVID [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-11,14-17 * column 3, lines 51-62; example 1; claims 1,2,4 * [Y] 12,13; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1987-046767[25], XP002132649 & JPS624433 A 19870110 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEM KK ; KAWAMURA INST CHEM RES) [X] 1-5,8,10,14,16 * abstract * |