EP1141595 - DEVICE WITH COMPONENTS CONCENTRICALLY DISPOSED AND ROTATIONAL IN RELATION TO EACH OTHER AND UTILIZATION OF SAID DEVICE IN TIRE INFLATING INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steyr-Daimler-Puch Spezialfahrzeug AG & Co. KG 2 Haidequerstrasse 3 1111 Wien / AT | [2001/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKOFF, Gerhard Maurer Lange Gasse 98/H20 A-1230 Wien / AT | 02 /
CHRISTELY, Heinz Bahnstrasse 1 A-2125 Neubau / AT | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Rippel, Andreas, et al Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rippel Kommandit-Partnerschaft Maxingstrasse 34 1130 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Rippel, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Rippel Kommandit-Partnerschaft Maxingstrasse 34 1130 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 00900445.8 | 13.01.2000 | [2001/41] | WO2000AT00005 | Priority number, date | AT19990000021 | 13.01.1999 Original published format: AT 2199 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0042337 | Date: | 20.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1141595 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1141595 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/16, F16N7/36 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
F16J15/162 (EP,US);
B60C23/00318 (EP,US);
B60C23/00363 (EP,US);
F16N7/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG MIT KONZENTRISCH ZUEINANDER ANGEORDNETEN UND RELATIV ZUEINANDER ROTIERBAREN BAUTEILEN UND VERWENDUNG DIESER ANORDNUNG BEI EINER REIFENFÜLLANLAGE | [2001/41] | English: | DEVICE WITH COMPONENTS CONCENTRICALLY DISPOSED AND ROTATIONAL IN RELATION TO EACH OTHER AND UTILIZATION OF SAID DEVICE IN TIRE INFLATING INSTALLATION | [2001/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF A ELEMENTS CONCENTRIQUES EN ROTATION LES UNS PAR RAPPORT AUX AUTRES, ET UTILISATION DE CE DISPOSITIF DANS UN SYSTEME DE GONFLAGE DES PNEUMATIQUES | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.06.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 20.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.11.2003 | FI | 05.11.2003 | IE | 05.11.2003 | NL | 05.11.2003 | AT | 13.01.2004 | LU | 13.01.2004 | BE | 31.01.2004 | CH | 31.01.2004 | LI | 31.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | DK | 05.02.2004 | GR | 05.02.2004 | SE | 05.02.2004 | ES | 16.02.2004 | PT | 05.04.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | CY | 05.11.2003 | |
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
AT | 13.01.2004 | ||
LU | 13.01.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2004 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/36] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
AT | 13.01.2004 | ||
LU | 13.01.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2004 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
LU | 13.01.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2004 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
BE | 31.01.2004 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
ES | 16.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
IE | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 05.11.2003 | |
SE | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 05.02.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4105746 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 31 - column 4, line 26; figure 2 *; | [A]DE3531237 (SCHWING HYDRAULIK ELEKTRONIK, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 35; figure - *; | [A]FR880243 (FREUDENBERG CARL) [A] 1 * column 2, line 36 - column 2, line 51; figure . *; | [A]FR2103056 (MASCH & WERKZEUGBAU GMBH) [A] 1 * page 3, line 37 - page 4, line 34; figure 2 *; | [A]US5052278 (SMILLIE III CHARLES M [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 35 - column 6, line 40; figure - *; | [PA]EP0916877 (VOITH AG J M [AT]) [PA] 1 * column 5, line 22 - column 7, line 4; figure - *; | [A]US3012829 (MARSHALL JAMES A) [A] 1 * figure . * |