EP1141896 - CODING AND DECODING BY ITERATED FUNCTION SYSTEMS (IFS) WITH OSCILLATING COLLAGE FUNCTIONS AND A SPATIAL COLLAGE FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states TELEDIFFUSION DE FRANCE 10, rue d'Oradour sur Glane 75732 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states TELEDIFFUSION DE FRANCE 10, rue d'Oradour sur Glane 75732 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERT, Guillaume La Grande Réauté F-35235 Thorigne Fouillard / FR | 02 /
LAURENT-CHATENET, Nathalie 24, square George Travers F-35700 Rennes / FR | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | ||
Former [2001/41] | Vidon, Patrice Le Nobel, 2, allée Antoine Becquerel BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00900589.3 | 14.01.2000 | [2001/41] | WO2000FR00081 | Priority number, date | FR19990000656 | 14.01.1999 Original published format: FR 9900656 | [2001/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0042572 | Date: | 20.07.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1141896 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1141896 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06T9/00, H04N1/41 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
H04N19/00 (EP);
H04N19/99 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, GB, IT, SE [2003/15] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KODIERUNG UND DEKODIERUNG MIT ITERIERTEN FUNKTIONENSYSTEMEN (IFS) MIT PERIODISCHEN FUNKTIONEN UND RÄUMLICHER KOLLAGENFUNKTION | [2001/41] | English: | CODING AND DECODING BY ITERATED FUNCTION SYSTEMS (IFS) WITH OSCILLATING COLLAGE FUNCTIONS AND A SPATIAL COLLAGE FUNCTION | [2001/41] | French: | CODAGE ET DECODAGE PAR DES SYSTEMES DE FONCTIONS ITEREES (IFS) AVEC DES FONCTIONS DE COLLAGE OSCILLANTE ET UNE FONCTION DE COLLAGE SPATIAL | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 19.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 09.04.2003 | GB | 09.04.2003 | IT | 09.04.2003 | SE | 09.07.2003 | DE | 10.07.2003 | [2007/35] |
Former [2004/23] | FI | 09.04.2003 | |
GB | 09.04.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
DE | 10.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | FI | 09.04.2003 | |
GB | 09.04.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 09.04.2003 | |
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 09.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5768437 (MONRO DONALD MARTIN ET AL) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US4941193 (BARNSLEY MICHAEL F ET AL) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A] - MONRO D M ET AL, "Deterministic rendering of self-affine fractals", IEE COLLOQUIUM ON 'APPLICATION OF FRACTAL TECHNIQUES IN IMAGE PROCESSING' (DIGEST NO.171), LONDON, UK, 3 DEC. 1990, 1990, London, UK, IEE, UK, pages 5/1 - 4, XP002126177 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - HAYES M H, "Iterated function systems for image and video coding", INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON IMAGE PROCESSING: THEORY, METHODOLOGY, SYSTEMS AND APPLICATIONS, BUDAPEST, HUNGARY, 20-22 JUNE 1994, Journal on Communications, May-June 1994, Hungary, vol. 45, ISSN 0866-5583, pages 11 - 19, XP002046218 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |