EP1146808 - COOKING UTENSIL WITH REMOVABLE GRIP HANDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M, Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | ||
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states SEB S.A. Les 4 M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VELO, Lionel 8, rue des Pâquerettes F-74150 Rumilly / FR | 02 /
MONTGELARD, Michel 13, grande rue d'Aléry F-74960 Cran Gevrier / FR | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Somnier, Jean-Louis, et al Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Somnier, Jean-Louis, et al Novamark Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00900601.6 | 18.01.2000 | [2001/43] | WO2000FR00097 | Priority number, date | FR19990000962 | 28.01.1999 Original published format: FR 9900962 | [2001/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0044269 | Date: | 03.08.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1146808 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1146808 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A47J45/07 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
A47J45/071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/43] | Title | German: | KOCHGESCHIRR MIT EINEM LÖSBAREN GRIFF | [2001/43] | English: | COOKING UTENSIL WITH REMOVABLE GRIP HANDLE | [2001/43] | French: | USTENSILE CULINAIRE A MANCHE DE PREHENSION AMOVIBLE | [2001/43] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/43] | 19.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.03.2005 | CY | 30.03.2005 | FI | 30.03.2005 | IE | 30.03.2005 | DK | 30.06.2005 | SE | 30.06.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/07] | AT | 30.03.2005 | |
FI | 30.03.2005 | ||
IE | 30.03.2005 | ||
DK | 30.06.2005 | ||
SE | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 30.03.2005 | |
FI | 30.03.2005 | ||
IE | 30.03.2005 | ||
DK | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 30.03.2005 | |
FI | 30.03.2005 | ||
DK | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 30.03.2005 | |
FI | 30.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 30.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2712151 (ADOLPH BECHT) [X] 1,4,7,8 * column 2, line 56 - line 60 * * figures 5-8 *; | [A]FR1330214 (LOING VERRERIES) [A] 3,5,8 * figures 1,3 *; | [A]GB1457467 (VERZINKEREI ZUG AG) [A] 1,12 * page 1, line 57 - line 61 * * claim 1 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]FR2734466 (IORIO DONATO DI [FR]) [A] 5 * page 3, line 8 - line 11 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0852924 (DJA CRISTEL [FR]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 3 ** figure 1 *; | [PX]US5887751 (KROSCHER TODD W [US]) [PX] 1 * column 2, line 62 - column 4, line 22 * * figures 1,2,4,5 * |