EP1227740 - DEVICE FOR FIXING AN ABSORBENT PAD ON A BRASSIERE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mallick, Corinne Simone 3, rue de la Petite Amérique 57905 Sarreinsming / FR | [2002/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Vièl, Christof Cabinet Vièl 9, rue des Jardins 57520 Grosbliederstroff / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | Vièl, Christof Cabinet Vièl 1, rue des Bleuets, BP 18 57520 Grosbliederstroff / FR | Application number, filing date | 00900667.7 | 26.01.2000 | [2002/32] | WO2000FR00175 | Priority number, date | FR19990000925 | 27.01.1999 Original published format: FR 9900925 | [2002/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0044249 | Date: | 03.08.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1227740 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1227740 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A41D27/13, A41C3/00 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
A41D27/13 (EP);
A41C3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/32] | Title | German: | BÜSTENHALTERBEFESTIGUNSVORRICHTUNG FÜR SAUGEINLAGE | [2002/32] | English: | DEVICE FOR FIXING AN ABSORBENT PAD ON A BRASSIERE | [2002/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UN COUSSINET ABSORBANT SUR UN SOUTIEN-GORGE | [2002/32] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 24.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.04.2003 | CY | 23.04.2003 | FI | 23.04.2003 | GB | 23.04.2003 | IE | 23.04.2003 | IT | 23.04.2003 | NL | 23.04.2003 | DK | 23.07.2003 | GR | 23.07.2003 | PT | 23.07.2003 | SE | 23.07.2003 | DE | 24.07.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
CY | 23.04.2003 | ||
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
GB | 23.04.2003 | ||
IE | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
DE | 24.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
GB | 23.04.2003 | ||
IE | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
DE | 24.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
GB | 23.04.2003 | ||
IE | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
IE | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 23.04.2003 | |
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | NL | 23.04.2003 | |
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 23.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [AD]CH149070 (POLLACK SEMMY [DE]) [AD] 1 * page 2, column 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 2, column 2, paragraph 1; figure 2 *; | [A]DE803890 (ELSE DEUBLE) [A] 1,3,10* page 2, line 65 - line 66; figure 1 *; | [X]US2911647 (DIXON IRMA G, et al) [X] 1,2,8,9 * column 1, line 27 * * column 2, line 3 * * column 2, line 35 - line 36; figure 1 *; | [AD]FR2098996 (ROLANDEZ JEANNE) [AD] 1,2 * page 3, line 23 * * page 3, line 29; figure 3 *; | [AD]US3744056 (BOND A) [AD] 1,2,8,9 * column 2, line 31 - line 37; figures 3,4 *; | [AD]DE3043182 (FRUSCA CECILIA, et al) [AD] 1,8,9 * page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraph 2; figure 3 *; | [AD]DE8907267U (WURDIGER) [AD] 1,2,8 * page 6, line 6 * * page 6, paragraph 4 * * page 7, paragraph 1; figures 1,3,4 *; | [YD]US5245707 (GREEN JANIS Y [US]) [YD] 1-10 * column 2, line 29 - line 33; figures 2,4 *; | [YD]DE29616796U (ERLHOEFER FABIAN [DE]) [YD] 1-10 * figure 1; claim 1 * |