EP1066984 - WRITING IMPLEMENT WITH A RETRACTABLE NIB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/02] | RETRACTABLE WRITING IMPLEMENT | ||
[2011/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PENTEL KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-2, Nihonbashi Koamicho Chuo-kuho, Tokyo 103-8538 / JP | [2001/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOUCHI, Nobuo, Pentel Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2, Nihonbashi Koami-cho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8538 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Shinya, Pentel Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2, Nihonbashi Koami-cho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8538 / JP | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingeisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/02] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00900887.1 | 24.01.2000 | [2001/02] | WO2000JP00317 | Priority number, date | JP19990019871 | 28.01.1999 Original published format: JP 1987199 | JP19990216132 | 30.07.1999 Original published format: JP 21613299 | JP19990309917 | 29.10.1999 Original published format: JP 30991799 | JP19990373438 | 28.12.1999 Original published format: JP 37343899 | [2001/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0044574 | Date: | 03.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1066984 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1066984 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B43K1/08, B43K24/08, B43K25/02 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
B43K24/084 (EP,US);
B43K24/08 (KR);
B43K1/088 (EP,US);
B43K25/028 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/02] | B43K24/08, B43K25/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2001/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SCHREIBGERÄT MIT ZURÜCKZIEHBARER SCHREIBSPITZE | [2011/04] | English: | WRITING IMPLEMENT WITH A RETRACTABLE NIB | [2011/04] | French: | OUTIL D'ÉCRITURE À POINTE RÉTRACTABLE | [2011/04] |
Former [2001/02] | ZURÜCKZIEHBARES SCHREIBGERÄT | ||
Former [2001/02] | RETRACTABLE WRITING IMPLEMENT | ||
Former [2001/02] | OUTIL D'ECRITURE RETRACTABLE | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2000 | Translation filed | 14.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 04.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2564755 (FEHLING HANS R) [A] 7 * column 1, line 5 - line 13 * * column 1, line 36 - line 49 * * column 3, line 25 - line 33 * * figure 2; claims 1-3 *; | [X]FR2566708 (MARTZ JACQUES [FR]) [X] 1-6 * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 2, line 5 - line 10 * * page 3, line 26 - line 28 * * page 4, line 1 - line 3 * * page 5, line 1 - line 10 * * page 6, line 9 - line 10 * * figures 1-4; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US4580919 (AMBASZ EMILIO [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 38 - line 47 * * column 2, line 62 - line 65 * * column 4, line 10 - line 24 ** figures 5,6; claims 1,8,9 *; | [X]FR2739323 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO [JP]) [X] 1-7 * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 4, line 9 - line 16 * * page 4, line 33 * * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 3 * * page 10, line 26 - page 11, line 3 * * figures 1A,3A,3B,4,7; claims 1,2,5 * | International search | [A]JPS5528529Y ; | [X]JPH0432310Y ; | [X]JPH0958182 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO); | [X]JPH10119481 (PILOT PEN CO LTD); | [X]JPH10264581 (ZEBRA PEN CORP); | [YP]JP2000108574 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO) | by applicant | JPH0999691 |