EP1164443 - ELECTRONIC TIMEPIECE HAVING INDICATION HANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Seiko Instruments Inc. 8 Nakase 1-chome, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATODATE, Takayuki, Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | 02 /
SHINO, Yuichi, Seiko Instruments Inc. 8, Nakase 1-chome Mihama-ku, Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-8507 / JP | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 00900896.2 | 24.01.2000 | [2001/51] | WO2000JP00326 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0155800 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1164443 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.08.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G04B19/00, G04B45/00, G04C3/00, G04C3/14 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
G04B45/00 (EP,US);
G04B19/048 (EP,US);
G04B45/0061 (EP,US);
G04C17/00 (EP,US);
G04C3/14 (EP,US);
G04C3/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2001/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE UHR MIT ZEIGERANZEIGE | [2001/51] | English: | ELECTRONIC TIMEPIECE HAVING INDICATION HANDS | [2001/51] | French: | PIECE D'HORLOGERIE ELECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT DES AIGUILLES INDICATRICES | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2001 | Translation filed | 10.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 01.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/04] | 06.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]JP2000126471 ; | [A]GB752804 (ERWIN TRIEBOLD) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 60-76 * * column 3, lines 4-19 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]CH339107 (VILLARD HENRI [CH]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [XA]EP0564236 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,5 * column 4, lines 23-27 * * column 6, lines 41-57 * * column 8, lines 44-50 * * column 12, lines 3-21 * * column 17, line 9 - column 19, line 50 * * claims 9-11,15 * * figures 1,2,7,10 * [A] 2,4; | [A]US5283769 (RENTON JULIAN E [GB]) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 32 - column 4, line 25 * * claims 1-4 * * figures 1-4 *; | [E]WO0075735 (SII MARKETING INTERNATIONAL IN [US]) [E] 1-5* column W *; | [E]EP1102134 (AGENHOR SA [CH]) [E] 1-5 * column W *; | [E]EP1118915 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-5 * column W * | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, & JP2000126471 A 20000509 (RHYTHM WATCH CO LTD) [E] 1-5 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS57153294 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD); | [A]GB2128379 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD); | [A]JPS6027389U ; | [A]JPH04315987 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]JPH04366788 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD); | [A]JPH09297185 (KOTSUBO KK) |