EP1144783 - DOOR STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast-natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | ||
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states Rechtspersoon naar publiek recht Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast-Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | ||
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Beheermaatschappij H.D. Groeneveld B.V. Ringdijk 542-544 2987 VZ Ridderkerk / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROENEVELD, Dirk, Hugo Waaldijk 135 NL-2988 AW Ridderkerk / NL | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2001/42] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00900961.4 | 04.01.2000 | [2001/42] | WO2000NL00003 | Priority number, date | NL19991010945 | 04.01.1999 Original published format: NL 1010945 | [2001/42] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0040828 | Date: | 13.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1144783 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1144783 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05B17/00, B63B43/32, E05C9/06 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
E05B17/0025 (EP,US);
B63B43/32 (EP,US);
E05C9/063 (EP,US);
E05B51/023 (EP,US);
E05B63/0052 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TÜRKONSTRUKTION | [2001/42] | English: | DOOR STRUCTURE | [2001/42] | French: | STRUCTURE DE PORTE | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2001 | Translation filed | 24.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 07.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Request for further processing for: | 11.07.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 11.07.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.07.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.07.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.09.2003 | CH | 24.09.2003 | CY | 24.09.2003 | LI | 24.09.2003 | LU | 04.01.2004 | IE | 05.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/23] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
LU | 04.01.2004 | ||
IE | 05.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
IE | 05.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 24.09.2003 | |
CH | 24.09.2003 | ||
LI | 24.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 24.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2511286 (MILLEN LINCOLN H); | [A]US5086587 (ANDREWS ZENAS B [US]); | [A]US5199369 (MEYER JEFFRY R [US], et al); | [XDA]WO9844228 (GROENEVELD H D BEHEER [NL], et al) [XD] 1-5,10,12,14 * the whole document * [A] 13,15,16 |