EP1140391 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AND/OR MAINTAINING THE TEMPERATURE OF A MELT, PREFERABLY OF A STEEL MELT DURING CONTINUOUS CASTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag Aktiengesellschaft Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | For:BE
CH
DK
CY
ES
FI
FR
GR
IE
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
DIDIER-WERKE AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 1 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [2003/43] |
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states SMS Demag Aktiengesellschaft Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For:BE
CH
LI
CY
ES
FI
FR
GR
IE
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
DIDIER-WERKE AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 1 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | |||
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states SMS Demag Aktiengesellschaft Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states DIDIER-WERKE AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 1 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | |||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
For all designated states DIDIER-WERKE AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 1 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROTHE, Horst Hermann-Löns-Strasse 17 D-41564 Kaarst / DE | 02 /
REIFFERSCHEID, Markus Bahnhofstrasse 42 D-40883 Ratingen / DE | 03 /
BRÜCKNER, Raimund Gartenfeldstrasse 21A D-65227 Niedernhausen-Engenhahn / DE | 04 /
SCHMITT, Karl-Heinz Bachwiese 25 D-55494 Dichtelbach / DE | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00901067.9 | 07.01.2000 | [2001/41] | WO2000EP00058 | Priority number, date | DE1999100915 | 13.01.1999 Original published format: DE 19900915 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0041829 | Date: | 20.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1140391 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1140391 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/10, B22D41/005, B22D41/015, H05B6/38, B22D11/16 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
B22D41/015 (EP,US);
B22D11/10 (KR);
B22D11/11 (EP,US);
B22D11/16 (EP,US);
B22D41/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINSTELLEN UND/ODER HALTEN DER TEMPERATUR EINER SCHMELZE, BEVORZUGT EINER STAHLSCHMELZE BEIM STRANGGIESSEN | [2001/41] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AND/OR MAINTAINING THE TEMPERATURE OF A MELT, PREFERABLY OF A STEEL MELT DURING CONTINUOUS CASTING | [2001/41] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REGLER ET/OU MAINTENIR LA TEMPERATURE D'UNE MASSE EN FUSION, EN PARTICULIER D'ACIER EN FUSION LORS DE LA COULEE EN CONTINU | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 05.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.06.2003 | FI | 18.06.2003 | FR | 18.06.2003 | IE | 18.06.2003 | NL | 18.06.2003 | DK | 18.09.2003 | GR | 18.09.2003 | PT | 18.09.2003 | SE | 18.09.2003 | ES | 29.09.2003 | LU | 07.01.2004 | BE | 31.01.2004 | CH | 31.01.2004 | LI | 31.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
FR | 18.06.2003 | ||
IE | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
DK | 18.09.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
ES | 29.09.2003 | ||
LU | 07.01.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2004 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
IE | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
DK | 18.09.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
ES | 29.09.2003 | ||
LU | 07.01.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2004 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
IE | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
DK | 18.09.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
ES | 29.09.2003 | ||
BE | 31.01.2004 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
IE | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
DK | 18.09.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
ES | 29.09.2003 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
IE | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
DK | 18.09.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
ES | 29.09.2003 | ||
CH | 31.01.2004 | ||
LI | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
IE | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
DK | 18.09.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
ES | 29.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
IE | 18.06.2003 | ||
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
ES | 29.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
PT | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
ES | 29.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
SE | 18.09.2003 | ||
ES | 29.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 18.06.2003 | |
NL | 18.06.2003 | ||
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
ES | 29.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | NL | 18.06.2003 | |
GR | 18.09.2003 | ||
ES | 29.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 18.06.2003 | |
GR | 18.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH02207949 ; | [X]JPH03243254 ; | [X]JPS6015054 ; | [X]US4469162 (HANAS BERTIL [SE], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 10 - line 66; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5084089 (ZEKELY JULIAN [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 2; figure 2 *; | [XA]EP0755741 (DIDIER WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 7 * column 1, line 59 - column 3, line 47; figure . *[A] 2-6; | [XP]DE19752548 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [XP] 1 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 40; figures 1,2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901102), vol. 014, no. 501, Database accession no. (M - 1043), & JP02207949 A 19900817 (SUMITOMO HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920128), vol. 016, no. 034, Database accession no. (M - 1204), & JP03243254 A 19911030 (NKK CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850607), vol. 009, no. 132, Database accession no. (M - 385), & JP60015054 A 19850125 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA JUKOGYO KK) [X] 1 * abstract * |