EP1165847 - CYANIDE RECOVERY FROM AQUEOUS ORE PROCESSING SOLUTIONS BY SOLVENT EXTRACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Placer Dome Technical Services Limited 1600-1055 Dunsmuir Street Vancouver British Columbia / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Placer Dome Technical Services Limited 1600-1055 Dunsmuir Street Vancouver, British Columbia / CA | ||
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Placer Dome Inc. 1400 - 1055 Dunsmuir Street Vancouver, British Columbia V7X 1P1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DREISINGER, David, Bruce 5233 Bentley Crescent Delta, British Columbia V4K 4K2 / CA | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Isern-Jara, Nuria J. Isern Patentes y Marcas Avda. Diagonal 463 Bis 2[deg] 08036 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Isern Jara, Nuria Avda. Diagonal, 463 Bis 2 08036 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 00901429.1 | 21.01.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000CA00053 | Priority number, date | US19990235876 | 22.01.1999 Original published format: US 235876 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0043558 | Date: | 27.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1165847 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1165847 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C22B11/08, C22B3/38, A62D3/00, C02F1/26 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
C22B11/08 (EP,US);
C02F1/26 (EP,US);
C22B3/38 (EP,US);
C22B3/384 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US);
Y10S210/903 (EP,US);
Y10S210/904 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTFERNUNG UND WIEDERGEWINNUNG VON CYANID AUS WÄSSRIGEN ERZAUFARBEITUNGSLÖSUNGEN MITTELS FLÜSSIG-FLÜSSIG EXTRAKTION | [2002/01] | English: | CYANIDE RECOVERY FROM AQUEOUS ORE PROCESSING SOLUTIONS BY SOLVENT EXTRACTION | [2002/01] | French: | RECUPERATION DE CYANURE DE SOLUTIONS AQUEUSES DE TRAITEMENT DE MINERAI PAR EXTRACTION DE SOLVANT | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.10.2001 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | 17.10.2001 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | 17.10.2001 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | 17.10.2001 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | 17.10.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | 17.10.2001 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | 17.10.2001 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | 17.10.2001 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | 17.10.2001 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | 17.10.2001 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | 17.10.2001 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | 17.10.2001 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | 17.10.2001 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | 17.10.2001 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | 17.10.2001 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | 17.10.2001 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | 17.10.2001 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | 17.10.2001 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.10.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   24.09.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2003 | BE | 28.05.2003 | CH | 28.05.2003 | CY | 28.05.2003 | FR | 28.05.2003 | IT | 28.05.2003 | LI | 28.05.2003 | NL | 28.05.2003 | DK | 28.08.2003 | GR | 28.08.2003 | PT | 28.08.2003 | SE | 28.08.2003 | DE | 29.08.2003 | IE | 21.01.2004 | LU | 21.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
BE | 28.05.2003 | ||
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
CY | 28.05.2003 | ||
FR | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
IE | 21.01.2004 | ||
LU | 21.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
BE | 28.05.2003 | ||
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FR | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
IE | 21.01.2004 | ||
LU | 21.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
BE | 28.05.2003 | ||
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
IE | 21.01.2004 | ||
LU | 21.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
BE | 28.05.2003 | ||
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
IE | 21.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
BE | 28.05.2003 | ||
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
BE | 28.05.2003 | ||
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 28.05.2003 | |
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 28.05.2003 | |
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 28.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5738318 ; | [A]US4540435 (MILLER JAN D [US], et al) [A] 2-7,14,15,20-23 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 37; examples I-II *; | [A]US5284991 (CHU HUMBERT H [US]); | [A]EP0698401 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1,2,20-22 * examples 2-25; claims 1-5 *; | [X] - F.L. MOORE AND W.S. GROENIER, "Removal and recovery of cyanide and zinc from electroplating wastes by solvent extraction", PLATING AND SURFACE FINISHING, East Orange, N.J., U.S.A., (197607), vol. 63, no. 7, pages 26 - 29, XP000908726 [X] 1,2,11,12 * page 27 - page 28; figure 1; table IV * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820616), vol. 006, no. 106, Database accession no. (C - 108), & JP57038318 A 19820303 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEM CO INC) [A] 1 * abstract * |