EP1148945 - NEW HYDROPHOBIC POLYMER COMPRISING FLUORINE MOIETIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexttec GmbH Hemmelrather Weg 201 51377 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states NExtTec GmbH Hemmelrather Weg 201 51377 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states Mira Diagnostica GmbH Hemmelrather Weg 201 51377 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPUSTIN, Dmitry Valerievich Ostrovitayanova st., b. 18, k.2, ap. 120 117321 Moskau / RU | 02 /
ZAVADA, Larissa Leonidovna Leninski prospekt, d. 70, kv. 552, B-261 117261 Moskau / RU | 03 /
BARSAMJAN, Grigorij Borisowitsch Novotuschinski proesd, d. 6, korp. 1, kv. 344 123310 Moskau / RU | 04 /
PONOMAREV, Nikolaj Nikolajewitsch ul. Marshala Birjusova, d. 9, kv. 39 123298 Moskau / RU | 05 /
LEISER, Robert-Matthias Dunkelnberger Str. 30 D-42697 Solingen / DE | 06 /
PLOBNER, Lutz Beckhauser Str. 9 D-40699 Erkrath / DE | 07 /
YAROSHEVSKAYA, Elena Markovna Ostlandstr. 51 D-50858 Köln / DE | 08 /
ZUBOV, Vitali Pavlovich Zvenigorodskaya st., b. 12, ap.8 121433 Moskau / RU | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 00901522.3 | 10.01.2000 | [2001/44] | WO2000EP00117 | Priority number, date | EP19990100416 | 11.01.1999 Original published format: EP 99100416 | [2001/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0041807 | Date: | 20.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1148945 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1148945 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/32, B01D15/08, C07H1/08 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
B01J20/3272 (EP,US);
B01D15/327 (EP,US);
B01J20/28026 (EP,US);
B01J20/28033 (EP,US);
B01J20/287 (EP,US);
B01J20/3268 (EP,US);
B01J20/327 (EP,US);
B01J20/328 (EP,US);
B01J20/3282 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
B01J2220/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/44] | Title | German: | NEUES FLUORGRUPPENENTHALTENDES HYDROPHOBES POLYMER | [2001/44] | English: | NEW HYDROPHOBIC POLYMER COMPRISING FLUORINE MOIETIES | [2001/44] | French: | NOUVEAU POLYMERE HYDROPHONE COMPRENANT DES FRACTIONS DE FLUOR | [2001/44] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 21.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 18.12.2002 | GR | 18.12.2002 | CY | 10.01.2003 | LU | 10.01.2003 | MC | 31.01.2003 | DK | 18.03.2003 | PT | 18.03.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/44] | FI | 18.12.2002 | |
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
CY | 10.01.2003 | ||
LU | 10.01.2003 | ||
DK | 18.03.2003 | ||
PT | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 18.12.2002 | |
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
LU | 10.01.2003 | ||
DK | 18.03.2003 | ||
PT | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | FI | 18.12.2002 | |
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
DK | 18.03.2003 | ||
PT | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 18.12.2002 | |
GR | 18.12.2002 | ||
PT | 18.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 18.12.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]RU2080905 ; | [A]EP0648777 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1,6,7 * page 7; claims 1-7 *; | [A]US5744257 (CARSTENS PIETER ANDRIES BLATT [ZA]) [A] 1,3,5 * column 1, line 36 - column 3, line 48 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 98, no. 07, Database accession no. 98-075292, XP002102878 & RU2080905 A 19970610 (BIOORGANIC CHEM INST) [A] 1,2,6-8,11 * abstract * |