Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004254311 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US85916204 | 03.06.2004 | JP2796299 | 04.02.1999 | US89065901 | 20.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1161982 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2004 | A4 | EP1161982 | 12.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0000583 | 03.02.2000 | JP2796299 | 04.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0045947 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2796299 | 04.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3655479B | Global Dossier | 02.06.2005 | B2 | JP2000225330 | 15.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2796299 | 04.02.1999 |