EP1161982 - FLOW REACTOR OF NONEQUILIBRIUM OPEN TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0012 / JP | ||
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Corporation 1-8, Hon-cho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUNO, Koichiro Mizuno 606-55 Sayama-shi Saitama 350-1317 / JP | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Calamita, Roberto Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Calamita, Roberto Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00902066.0 | 03.02.2000 | [2001/50] | WO2000JP00583 | Priority number, date | JP19990027962 | 04.02.1999 Original published format: JP 2796299 | [2001/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0045947 | Date: | 10.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1161982 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01J3/00, C12M1/40, B01J19/24, B01J3/04 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
B01J14/00 (EP);
B01J19/0013 (EP);
B01J19/2415 (EP);
B01J19/2465 (EP);
B01J3/00 (EP);
B01J3/042 (EP);
B01J2219/00094 (EP);
B01J2219/00099 (EP);
B01J2219/0011 (EP);
B01J2219/00135 (EP);
B01J2219/00166 (EP);
B01J2219/00184 (EP);
B01J2219/00245 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/50] | B01J3/00, C12M1/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | NICHT EKILIBRIERTER DURCHFLUSSREAKTOR OFFENEN TYPS | [2001/50] | English: | FLOW REACTOR OF NONEQUILIBRIUM OPEN TYPE | [2001/50] | French: | REACTEUR A CIRCULATION DE TYPE OUVERT NON EQUILIBRE | [2001/50] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2001 | Translation filed | 16.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2001 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 16.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 20.07.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9746494 (RPC WASTE MANAGEMENT SERVICES [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 8, line 31 - line 36 * * page 9, line 1 - line 3 * * page 8, line 10 - line 27 * * page 8, line 35 - line 36 * * page 11, line 30 - line 33 * * page 11, line 37 - page 12, line 2 *; | [X]US5405533 (HAZLEBECK DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1 * column A; figure - * * column 5, line 28 - line 30 * * column 5, line 45 - line 60 * * column 6, line 1 - line 12 * * column 6, line 27 - line 46 *; | [A]US5241048 (BARSTOW LEON E [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column A; example - * * column 1, line 32 - line 37 * * column 1, line 50 - line 55 * * column 1, line 62 - line 63 * * column 2, line 25 - line 29 * * column 2, line 41 - line 53 * * column 5, line 9 - line 12 * * column 5, line 37 - line 44 * * column 8, line 26 - line 38 * | [PX] - IMAI E ET AL, "ELONGATION OF OLIGOPEPTIDES IN A SIMULATED SUBMARINE HYDROTHERMAL SYSTEM", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (19990205), vol. 283, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 831 - 833, XP002936740 [PX] 1-6 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.283.5403.831 | International search | [A]JPS5825309 ; | [A]US4471095 |