EP1149413 - LOW TEMPERATURE PROCESS FOR FABRICATING LAYERED SUPERLATTICE MATERIALS AND MAKING ELECTRONIC DEVICES INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYMETRIX CORPORATION 5055 Mark Dabling Boulevard Colorado Springs, CO 80918 / US | [2001/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLAYAPPAN, Narayan 1410 Meredith Heights 206 Colorado Springs, CO 80919 / US | 02 /
JOSHI, Vikram 6719 Overland Drive Colorado Springs, CO 80919 / US | 03 /
PAZ DE ARAUJO, Carlos, A. 317 West Sunbird Cliffs Lane Colorado Springs, CO 80919 / US | [2001/44] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2001/44] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00902378.9 | 10.01.2000 | [2001/44] | WO2000US00566 | Priority number, date | US19990228907 | 11.01.1999 Original published format: US 228907 | [2001/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0042645 | Date: | 20.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1149413 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/316, H01L21/02, H01L27/115, C30B7/00 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
H01L21/02282 (EP,US);
C30B7/005 (EP,US);
H01L21/02197 (EP,US);
H01L21/022 (EP,US);
H01L21/02205 (EP,US);
H01L21/02337 (US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2001/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | NIEDERTEMPERATURPROZESS FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON ÜBERGITTERSTRUKTURMATERIALIEN UND HERSTELLUNG ELEKTRONISCHER BAUELEMENTE UNTER DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2001/44] | English: | LOW TEMPERATURE PROCESS FOR FABRICATING LAYERED SUPERLATTICE MATERIALS AND MAKING ELECTRONIC DEVICES INCLUDING SAME | [2001/44] | French: | PROCEDE BASSE TEMPERATURE DE FABRICATION DE MATERIAUX A SUPER TREILLIS AINSI QUE DE DISPOSITIF INCORPORANT CES MATERIAUX | [2001/44] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 10.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/35] | 31.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]US5508226 (ITO TAKESHI [US], et al) |