EP1243077 - MAINTAINING PERFORMANCE QUALITY OF BROADBAND SYSTEM IN THE PRESENCE OF NARROW BAND INTERFERENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISCO International, LLC 1560 Sherman Avenue Evanston, IL 60201 / US | [2009/52] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states ISCO International, Inc. 451 Kingston Ct. Mt. Prospect, IL 60056 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAGGER, Charles, E. 46 Foursome Crescent Toronto, Ontario M2P 1W3 / CA | 02 /
WILLETTS, Mark, N. 61 Twenty-Seventh Street Etobicoke, Ontario M8W 2X2 / CA | 03 /
TOBIA, Micolino 25 Ayton Cr. Woodbridge, Ontario L4L 7H8 / CA | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Jacoby, Georg, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Jacoby, Georg, et al Samson & Partner, Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00902521.4 | 02.02.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000CA00100 | Priority number, date | CA19992260653 | 02.02.1999 Original published format: CA 2260653 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0046929 | Date: | 10.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1243077 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1243077 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/12 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
H04B1/71 (EP);
H04B1/12 (KR);
H04B1/1036 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERHALTUNG DER QUALITÄT EINES BREITBANDÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEMS IN GEGENWART VON SCHMALBANDSTÖRUNGEN | [2002/39] | English: | MAINTAINING PERFORMANCE QUALITY OF BROADBAND SYSTEM IN THE PRESENCE OF NARROW BAND INTERFERENCE | [2002/39] | French: | MAINTIEN DE LA QUALITE DE RENDEMENT D'UN SYSTEME A LARGE BANDE EN PRESENCE DE SIGNAUX BROUILLEURS A BANDE ETROITE | [2002/39] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 29.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 25.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 14.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 31.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2004 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 31.12.2002 | [2003/28] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.07.2011 | DK | 27.07.2011 | GR | 28.10.2011 | PT | 28.11.2011 | IE | 02.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2013/08] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 27.07.2011 | |
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | GR | 28.10.2011 | |
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | PT | 28.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5168508 (IWASAKI KENJU [JP], et al) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * column 3, line 26 - column 5, line 56 *; | [X]EP0704986 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,5,7,22 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0812069 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,7 * abstract ** column 9, line 2 - column 11, line 18 * |