Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0178242 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2002 | A3 | WO0178242 | 18.10.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9706559 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2017 | B2 | US2016353455 | 01.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213543941 | 09.07.2012 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US201414580496 | 23.12.2014 | US201414218201 | 18.03.2014 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201514793830 | 08.07.2015 | US201514967804 | 14.12.2015 | US201615234633 | 11.08.2016 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9451495 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2016 | B2 | US2016100327 | 07.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213543941 | 09.07.2012 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US201414580496 | 23.12.2014 | US201414218201 | 18.03.2014 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201514793830 | 08.07.2015 | US201514967804 | 14.12.2015 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9788331 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2017 | B2 | US2015382225 | 31.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514790879 | 02.07.2015 | US201414264298 | 29.04.2014 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201213587166 | 16.08.2012 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9232423 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2016 | B2 | US2015312785 | 29.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213543941 | 09.07.2012 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US201414580496 | 23.12.2014 | US201414218201 | 18.03.2014 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201514793830 | 08.07.2015 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9894662 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2018 | B2 | US2015214998 | 30.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201213587166 | 16.08.2012 | US201314062072 | 24.10.2013 | US201414285173 | 22.05.2014 | US201213593741 | 24.08.2012 | US201514682802 | 09.04.2015 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9215723 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2015 | B2 | US2015214997 | 30.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414264299 | 29.04.2014 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201213587166 | 16.08.2012 | US201514682773 | 09.04.2015 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9247553 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2016 | B2 | US2015200696 | 16.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414281254 | 19.05.2014 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US201414573803 | 17.12.2014 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201213587168 | 16.08.2012 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9198055 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2015 | B2 | US2015194990 | 09.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213543941 | 09.07.2012 | US201414260758 | 24.04.2014 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | US201514661491 | 18.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9100850 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2015 | B2 | US2015139077 | 21.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213543941 | 09.07.2012 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US201414580496 | 23.12.2014 | US201414218201 | 18.03.2014 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9107224 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2015 | B2 | US2015139013 | 21.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213551447 | 17.07.2012 | US201414291169 | 30.05.2014 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201514596847 | 14.01.2015 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9100867 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2015 | B2 | US2015139012 | 21.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213543941 | 09.07.2012 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201414218203 | 18.03.2014 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US201514596832 | 14.01.2015 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9100860 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2015 | B2 | US2015080042 | 19.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201213587166 | 16.08.2012 | US201213593750 | 24.08.2012 | US201414492426 | 22.09.2014 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8976700 | Global Dossier | 10.03.2015 | B2 | US2014328197 | 06.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213551447 | 17.07.2012 | US201414291169 | 30.05.2014 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9031509 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2015 | B2 | US2014308900 | 16.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314044262 | 02.10.2013 | US201213551440 | 17.07.2012 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201414314674 | 25.06.2014 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8971207 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2015 | B2 | US2014286181 | 25.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213543941 | 09.07.2012 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201414218203 | 18.03.2014 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8948141 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2015 | B2 | US2014256371 | 11.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414281254 | 19.05.2014 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201213587168 | 16.08.2012 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9026057 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2015 | B2 | US2014254488 | 11.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201213587166 | 16.08.2012 | US201314062072 | 24.10.2013 | US201414285173 | 22.05.2014 | US201213593741 | 24.08.2012 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9014100 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2015 | B2 | US2014233461 | 21.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213543941 | 09.07.2012 | US201414260758 | 24.04.2014 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9025571 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2015 | B2 | US2014233418 | 21.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414264299 | 29.04.2014 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201213587166 | 16.08.2012 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9100859 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2015 | B2 | US2014233417 | 21.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414264298 | 29.04.2014 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201213587166 | 16.08.2012 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8948328 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2015 | B2 | US2014198887 | 17.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213543941 | 09.07.2012 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US201414218201 | 18.03.2014 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8792833 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2014 | B2 | US2014051468 | 20.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314044262 | 02.10.2013 | US201213551440 | 17.07.2012 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8774723 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2014 | B2 | US2014045432 | 13.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201213587166 | 16.08.2012 | US201314062072 | 24.10.2013 | US201213593741 | 24.08.2012 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8634386 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2014 | B2 | US2013029659 | 31.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201213587166 | 16.08.2012 | US201213593741 | 24.08.2012 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8743842 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2014 | B2 | US2013029658 | 31.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | US201213587170 | 16.08.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8873464 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2014 | B2 | US2012322478 | 20.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201213587166 | 16.08.2012 | US201213593750 | 24.08.2012 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9215719 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2015 | B2 | US2012322389 | 20.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201213587166 | 16.08.2012 | US201213593794 | 24.08.2012 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8750259 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2014 | B2 | US2012315937 | 13.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201213587166 | 16.08.2012 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8767628 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2014 | B2 | US2012309438 | 06.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201213587168 | 16.08.2012 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8718024 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2014 | B2 | US2012282920 | 08.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US201213551442 | 17.07.2012 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8576808 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2013 | B2 | US2012282919 | 08.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213551440 | 17.07.2012 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8750258 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2014 | B2 | US2012282918 | 08.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | US201213548389 | 13.07.2012 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8780808 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2014 | B2 | US2012281731 | 08.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213551447 | 17.07.2012 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8724552 | Global Dossier | 13.05.2014 | B2 | US2012275492 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213543941 | 09.07.2012 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008160916 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10039117 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2018 | B2 | US2017280464 | 28.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213543941 | 09.07.2012 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US201414580496 | 23.12.2014 | US201414218201 | 18.03.2014 | US97101708 | 08.01.2008 | US201514793830 | 08.07.2015 | US201715621086 | 13.06.2017 | US201514967804 | 14.12.2015 | US201615234633 | 11.08.2016 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20020001729 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | CA0000100 | 02.02.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5124709B | Global Dossier | 23.01.2013 | B2 | JP2003530756 | 14.10.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0111351 | 06.04.2001 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002536905 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | CA0000100 | 02.02.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1269639 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2007 | B1 | EP1269639 | 02.01.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0111351 | 06.04.2001 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5142401 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0111351 | 06.04.2001 | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2426800 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | CA0000100 | 02.02.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1243077 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2011 | B1 | EP1243077 | 25.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA0000100 | 02.02.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE363770T | 15.06.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE518311T | 15.08.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CA0000100 | 02.02.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1265560C | 19.07.2006 | C | CN1439198 | 27.08.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60128665T | 27.09.2007 | T2 | DE60128665D1 | 12.07.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0111351 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1046337 | 12.01.2007 | B | HK1046337 | 03.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA0000100 | 02.02.2000 | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1057950 | 23.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0111351 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7317698 | 08.01.2008 | B2 | US2002057751 | 16.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6704378 | 09.03.2004 | B2 | US2002154614 | 24.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US82764101 | 06.04.2001 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | US9390402 | 08.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6807405 | 19.10.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US30147799 | 28.04.1999 | US19538700 | 07.04.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0046929 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2001 | A9 | WO0046929 | 10.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2260653 | 17.04.2001 | C | CA2260653 | 19.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2342402 | 02.09.2003 | C | CA2342402 | 19.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1268065C | 02.08.2006 | C | CN1339198 | 06.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2369974T | 09.12.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CA2260653 | 02.02.1999 |