EP1150598 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO ELECTRICALLY HEATED VESSELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTTER CONTROLS LIMITED Hardwick Square South Buxton Derbyshire SK17 6LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states OTTER CONTROLS LIMITED Hardwick Square South Buxton, Derbyshire SK17 6LA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'NEILL, Robert Andrew "Morcot", Alexandra Road, Buxton Derbyshire SK17 9NQ / GB | 02 /
HOWARTH, John Anthony 21 St. James Terrace, Buxton Derbyshire SK17 6HS / GB | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Milhench, Howard Leslie, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Milhench, Howard Leslie, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00902729.3 | 08.02.2000 | [2001/45] | WO2000GB00372 | Priority number, date | GB19990002784 | 08.02.1999 Original published format: GB 9902784 | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0047094 | Date: | 17.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1150598 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1150598 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/21 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
A47J27/21166 (EP);
A47J27/2105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/01] |
Former [2003/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | ||
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN AN ELEKTRISCH GEHEIZTEN KOCHGEFÄSSEN | [2001/45] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO ELECTRICALLY HEATED VESSELS | [2001/45] | French: | AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES A DES RECIPIENTS CHAUFFES ELECTRIQUEMENT | [2001/45] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 07.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.08.2003 | BE | 20.08.2003 | CH | 20.08.2003 | CY | 20.08.2003 | ES | 20.08.2003 | FI | 20.08.2003 | IT | 20.08.2003 | LI | 20.08.2003 | NL | 20.08.2003 | DK | 20.11.2003 | GR | 20.11.2003 | SE | 20.11.2003 | PT | 20.01.2004 | LU | 08.02.2004 | IE | 09.02.2004 | MC | 28.02.2004 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
CY | 20.08.2003 | ||
ES | 20.08.2003 | ||
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
DK | 20.11.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
LU | 08.02.2004 | ||
IE | 09.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
DK | 20.11.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
LU | 08.02.2004 | ||
IE | 09.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
DK | 20.11.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
IE | 09.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
DK | 20.11.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
DK | 20.11.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
DK | 20.11.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
FI | 20.08.2003 | ||
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 20.08.2003 | |
NL | 20.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 20.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0285839 (EGO ELEKTRO BLANC & FISCHER [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,7,11-13,15-17 * claims 1,2 * * column 14, line 8 - line 21 * * figures 1,1A,7,9 * [Y] 2,18; | [XA]DE9411507U (SEB SA [FR]) [X] 1,4,5,7,11,12,15-17 * claims 1,5,6,9,10 * * figures 2,4,6 *[A] 6,18; | [Y]DE4406567 (VOLZ ABC ELEKTROGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 2,18 * claims 3-7 * * figure 1 *; | [XA]GB2307602 (OTTER CONTROLS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5,7,9,11,12,15 * page 11, line 9 - page 14, line 8 * * figures 2,3 * [A] 17,18 | by applicant | WO9406185 | WO9618331 | EP0807394 | GB2330064 |