EP1160610 - REFLECTION OPTICAL DEVICE, REFLECTION SOLID-STATE OPTICAL DEVICE, IMAGING DEVICE COMPRISING THIS, MULTIWAVELENGTH IMAGING DEVICE, VIDEO CAMERA, AND MONITORING DEVICE MOUNTED ON VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIKAWA, Motonobu 7-9, Yuzato 1-chome, Higashisumiyoshi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 546-0013 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Yoshiharu 2-20-23, Miyayama-cho Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0056 / JP | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Stippl, Hubert, et al Patentanwälte Freiligrathstrasse 7a 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Stippl, Hubert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Freiligrathstrasse 7a 90482 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2001/49] | Stippl, Hubert, Dipl.-Ing. Hafner & Stippl, Patentanwälte, Schleiermacherstrasse 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00902890.3 | 09.02.2000 | [2001/49] | WO2000JP00728 | Priority number, date | JP19990032881 | 10.02.1999 Original published format: JP 3288199 | JP19990128493 | 10.05.1999 Original published format: JP 12849399 | JP19990297123 | 19.10.1999 Original published format: JP 29712399 | [2001/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0048033 | Date: | 17.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1160610 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B17/06 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
G02B17/086 (EP,US);
G02B17/02 (KR);
B60R1/10 (EP,US);
G02B13/14 (EP,US);
G02B17/0621 (EP,US);
G02B17/0663 (EP,US);
G02B17/0816 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/49] | G02B17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | REFLEKTIERENDE OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG, REFLEKTIERENDE OPTISCHE FESTKÖRPER-VOORICHTUNG, VERWENDUNG IN BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, POLYCHROMATISCHE BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VIDEOKAMERA AND MONITOR MIT FAHRZEUGMONTAGE | [2001/49] | English: | REFLECTION OPTICAL DEVICE, REFLECTION SOLID-STATE OPTICAL DEVICE, IMAGING DEVICE COMPRISING THIS, MULTIWAVELENGTH IMAGING DEVICE, VIDEO CAMERA, AND MONITORING DEVICE MOUNTED ON VEHICLE | [2001/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE REFLECTEUR, DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE REFLECTEUR A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE COMPORTANT CEUX-CI, DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE A LONGUEURS D'ONDES MULTIPLES, CAMERA VIDEO ET DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE MONTE SUR UN VEHICULE | [2001/49] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2001 | Translation filed | 20.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2001 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 23.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/35] | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]JPH1114906 (CANON KK) [XD] 1-10,32-34 * paragraphs [0053] , [0055] , [0057] , [0070] , [0083]; figures 1,5 * [Y] 41; | [Y]EP0313216 (OPTICAL PROFILE INC [US]) [Y] 41 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4733955 (COOK LACY G [US]); | [Y]US4834517 (COOK LACY G [US]); | [Y]EP0601871 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [Y]EP0730169 (CANON KK [JP]); | [Y]JPH10206986 (TOPCON CORP, et al); | [X]EP0732168 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [X]JPH05288899 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND); | [Y]EP0656552 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [Y]EP0689075 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [Y]EP0730183 (CANON KK [JP]); | [Y]JPS5442674Y ; | [Y]EP0025188 (CERBERUS AG [CH]); | [Y]JPS62164010 (RICOH KK); | [Y]JPH10221603 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH10333040 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [Y]JPH04318697 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JPH03274971 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPH03125573 (YOKOGAWA MEDICAL SYST); | [YP]EP0880032 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [YP]JPH11132860 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [YP]JPH11168680 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [XP]EP0921427 (CANON KK [JP]); | [Y]US5841574 (WILLEY GILBERT W [US]) |