EP1073272 - SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD AND VIDEO/AUDIO PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALKER, Toby Sony Corp. 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
MATSUBARA, Hiroshi Sony Corp. 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2011/36] |
Former [2001/05] | 01 /
WALKER, Toby Sony Corp., 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUBARA, Hiroshi Sony Corp., 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Representative(s) | Turner, James Arthur, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Turner, James Arthur, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2001/05] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00902920.8 | 10.02.2000 | [2001/05] | WO2000JP00762 | Priority number, date | JP19990036338 | 15.02.1999 Original published format: JP 3633899 | [2001/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0048397 | Date: | 17.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1073272 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1073272 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (KR);
G06V20/41 (EP,US);
G06F16/683 (EP,US);
G06F16/7834 (EP,US);
G06F16/785 (EP,US);
G11B27/28 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/05] | H04N5/76, H04N5/93 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2001/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON SIGNALEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON BILD/TON | [2011/07] | English: | SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD AND VIDEO/AUDIO PROCESSING DEVICE | [2001/05] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT VIDEO/AUDIO | [2001/05] |
Former [2001/05] | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON SIGNALEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG BON BILD/TON | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2000 | Translation filed | 06.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 04.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.10.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 09.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2005 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5805733 (WANG KATHERINE [US], et al) [X] 1,3-10,12-17 * abstract * * column 1, line 17 - column 2, line 15 * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 35 * * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 25 *; | [A] - JONGJIANG ZHANG ET AL, "Structured and content-based video browsing", SIGNALS, SYSTEMS & COMPUTERS, 1998. CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE THIRTY-SECOND ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON PACIFIC GROVE, CA, USA 1-4 NOV. 1998, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19981101), ISBN 0-7803-5148-7, pages 910 - 914, XP010324279 [A] 1-17 * page 910, column R, line 41 - page 912, column L, line 18 * * page 912, column R, line 17 - page 912, column R, line 51 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.1998.751014 | [A] - MCGEE T ET AL, "PARSING TV PROGRAMS FOR IDENTIFICATION AND REMOVAL OF NON-STORY SEGMENTS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (1998), vol. 3656, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 243 - 251, XP000972571 [A] 1-17 * abstract * * page 244, line 37 - page 244, line 45 * * page 246, line 1 - page 246, line 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.333844 | [AD] - KENDER J R ET AL, "Video scene segmentation via continuous video coherence", COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, 1998. PROCEEDINGS. 1998 IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON SANTA BARBARA, CA, USA 23-25 JUNE 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19980623), ISBN 0-8186-8497-6, pages 367 - 373, XP010291635 [AD] 1-17 * page 367, column R, line 27 - page 368, column R, line 2 * * page 372, column L, line 26 - page 372, column R, line 39 * * page 373, column R, line 1 - page 373, column R, line 29 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.1998.698632 | International search | [A]JPH07193748 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [X]EP0711078 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JPH10257436 (MATSUSHITA ATSUSHI, et al); | [AE]EP0907147 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) | Examination | US5870754 |