EP1072576 - FLUORINATING AGENT, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/31] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/05] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6070 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Hidetoshi Seinen-ryo, 2-13, Kogane-machi Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-0872 / JP | 02 /
SONODA, Hiroshi 449-5, Takuma Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 837-0916 / JP | 03 /
GOTO, Ken'ichi 136, Hirabaru Apartment, 300 Hirabaru-machi Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-0813 / JP | 04 /
FUKUMURA, Kouki 424, Hirabaru Apartment, 300 Hirabaru-machi Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-0813 / JP | 05 /
NARUSE, Junko 135, Hirabaru Apartment, 300 Hirabaru-machi Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-0813 / JP | 06 /
OIKAWA, Hideaki 117, Joshin-machi Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-0844 / JP | 07 /
NAGATA, Teruyuki 89-4, Shiragene-machi Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-0052 / JP | 08 /
SHIMAOKA, Takashi Mitsuinagafuji-ryo, 1-1, Yusyudaihigashi Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0124 / JP | 09 /
YASUTAKE, Tsuyoshi 2-4-1, Yusyudainishi Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0125 / JP | 10 /
UMETANI, Hideki 138-1, Machibo Mobara-shi, Chiba 297-0022 / JP | 11 /
KITASHIMA, Toshio Miyanodai-ryo, 2142, Togo Mobara-shi, Chiba 297-0017 / JP | [2006/49] |
Former [2001/05] | 01 /
HAYASHI, Hidetoshi Seinen-ryo, 2-13, Kogane-machi Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-0872 / JP | ||
02 /
SONODA, Hiroshi 449-5, Takuma Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 837-0916 / JP | |||
03 /
GOTO, Ken'ichi 136, Hirabaru Apartment, 300 Hirabaru-machi Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-0813 / JP | |||
04 /
FUKUMURA, Kouki 424, Hirabaru Apartment, 300 Hirabaru-machi Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-0813 / JP | |||
05 /
NARUSE, Junko 135, Hirabaru Apartment, 300 Hirabaru-machi Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-0813 / JP | |||
06 /
OIKAWA, Hideaki 117, Joshin-machi Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-0844 / JP | |||
07 /
NAGATA, Teruyuki 89-4, Shiragene-machi Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-0052 / JP | |||
08 /
SHIMAOKA, Takashi Mitsuinagafuji-ryo, 1-1, Yusyudaihigashi Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0124 / JP | |||
09 /
YASUTAKE, T., C33-405, Mitsuiyusyunishisyata-ku 2-4-1, Yusyudainishi Ichihara-shi, Chiba 299-0125 / JP | |||
10 /
UMETANI, Hideki 138-1, Machibo Mobara-shi, Chiba 297-0022 / JP | |||
11 /
KITASHIMA, Toshio Miyanodai-ryo, 2142, Togo Mobara-shi, Chiba 297-0017 / JP | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2001/05] | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00902941.4 | 14.02.2000 | [2001/05] | WO2000JP00785 | Priority number, date | JP19990035194 | 15.02.1999 Original published format: JP 3519499 | JP19990192503 | 07.07.1999 Original published format: JP 19250399 | JP19990192504 | 07.07.1999 Original published format: JP 19250499 | JP19990192505 | 07.07.1999 Original published format: JP 19250599 | JP19990192506 | 07.07.1999 Original published format: JP 19250699 | [2001/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0047539 | Date: | 17.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1072576 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1072576 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07B39/00, C07C233/03, C07C233/05, C07C275/06, C07C69/14, C07C43/11, C07C43/225, C07C41/22, C07C17/20, C07C22/08, C07F9/24, C07D207/267, C07D233/34, C07D239/10, C07D231/14, C07D239/30 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
C07B39/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07C17/202 (EP,US);
C07C17/206 (EP,US);
C07C275/06 (EP,US);
C07C41/22 (EP,US);
C07D207/267 (EP,US);
C07D231/14 (EP,US);
C07D231/16 (EP,US);
C07D233/32 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C17/202, C07C22/08 (EP,US);
C07C17/206, C07C22/08 (US,EP);
C07C41/22, C07C43/225 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/05] | Title | German: | FLUORIERUNGSMITTEL, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND SEINE ANWENDUNG | [2001/05] | English: | FLUORINATING AGENT, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND USE THEREOF | [2001/05] | French: | AGENT DE FLUORATION, SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION | [2001/05] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2000 | Translation filed | 10.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 28.12.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 02.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61180727 ; | [A]JP4124176 ; | [A]DD301662 (HUMBOLDT UNIVERSITÄT ZU BERLIN) [A] 1-28* the whole document *; | [A]EP0560109 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870107), vol. 0110, no. 03, Database accession no. (C - 395), & JP61180727 A 19860813 (TOKUYAMA SODA CO LTD) [A] 1-28 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920817), vol. 0163, no. 83, Database accession no. (C - 0974), & JP4124176 A 19920424 (TOOKEMU PURODAKUTSU:KK) [A] 1-28 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH06256224 (HOKKO CHEM IND CO, et al); | [X]JPH10158247 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [AP]JP2000038370 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [AE]JP2000053650 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC); | [X] - MITSUNORI TSUDA ET AL., "Hydrogen bonding systems containing hydrogen fluoride. III. Infrared frequency shifts and CNDO/2 calculations on HF-carbonyl compound complexes", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN,, (1976), vol. 49, no. 9, pages 2391 - 2396, XP002928399 | [X] - SHIGENORI UTSUMI., "Yokaizai to shiteno dimethylacetamide, Pyridine san fukabutsu no sayo", BUNSAKI KAGAKU,, (1980), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 23 - 26, XP002933201 | [X] - SHIGENORI UTSUMI., "N-methyl-2-pyrrolidone san fukabutsu wo yokaizai to suru yuki kinzoku kagobutsu no kansetsu teiryo", BUNSEKI KAGAKU,, (1981), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 129 - 131, XP002933202 | [X] - BROWN DENNIS G. ET AL., "The linear delta H-delta nu (sub C:O) relation for ethyl acetate adducts and its significance for donor-acceptor interactions", CAPLUS, Database accession no. 1968:501582, XP002933203 | [ ] - J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1968), vol. 90, no. 21, pages 5706 - 5712 | [A] - GEORGE A. OLAH ET AL., "Synthetic methods and reactions. 63. Pyridinium poly(hydrogen fluoride) (30% Pyridine-70% hydrogen fluoride): A convenient reagent for organic fluorination reactions", J. ORG. CHEM.,, (1979), vol. 44, no. 22, pages 3872 - 3881, XP002928400 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01336a027 |