EP1144798 - PIPE HANDLING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Well Engineering Partners B.V. Tynaarlosestraat 68 9481 AE Vries / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAKKER, Thomas, Walburgis Tynaarlosestraat 68 NL-9481 AE Vries / NL | 02 /
VAN MOURIK, Arno Stadionkade 96-3 NL-1076 BL Amsterdam / NL | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Dijkhuis ev Boon, Anouk Hélène J. Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Boon-Dijkhuis, Anouk Hélène J. Shell International B.V., Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2001/42] | Prins, Adrianus Willem Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 00903025.5 | 19.01.2000 | [2001/42] | WO2000NL00037 | Priority number, date | NL19991011069 | 19.01.1999 Original published format: NL 1011069 | [2001/42] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0043630 | Date: | 27.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1144798 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1144798 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E21B19/16, E21B19/22, F16L13/02 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
E21B19/20 (EP,US);
E21B19/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2004/20] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HANDHABUNG VON BOHRLOCHGESTÄNGEN | [2001/42] | English: | PIPE HANDLING APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2001/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE MANIPULATION DE TUYAUX | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2001 | Translation filed | 17.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 14.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.04.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3667554 (SMITHERMAN EUGENE A) [A] 1,18 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3677345 (SIZER PHILLIP S) [Y] 5-9 * column 2, lines 34-55 *; | [A]US3724567 (SMITHERMAN E) [A] 1,18 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1405359 (INST ELEKTROSWARKI PATONA, et al) [X] 1-4,12,18-20 * claim 1 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US4848455 (FENYVESI JANOS [HU]) [A] 1,18* the whole document *; | [XY]EP0396204 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 1-4,12,13,18-21 * claims 1,2,4 * * figure 1 * [Y] 5-9; | [A]US5013880 (PUETTMANN FRANZ-JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1,18 * claim 1 * |