EP1064443 - Apparatus to support a lamp post and its use with such a lamp post [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/01] | APPARATUS TO SUPPORT A LAMP POST, AND SUCH A LAMP POST | ||
[2007/30] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InnoSpecial Products B.V. Rivium Quadrant 90 2909 LC Capelle a/d Ijssel / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Innospecial Products B.V. Rivium Quadrant 90 2909 LC Capelle a/d Ijssel / NL | ||
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states Rocad Engineering Stationsstraat 12 1541 LH Koog aan de Zaan / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAHERTIAN, Roy, Richard Hollander 11 NL-1531 NM Wormer / NL | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Jessen, Leonardus Johannes Julius V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Jessen, Leonardus Johannes Julius Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2001/01] | Van Breda, Jacobus Octrooibureau Los & Stigter, P.O. Box 20052 1000 HB Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 00903029.7 | 19.01.2000 | [2001/01] | WO2000NL00041 | Priority number, date | NL19991011083 | 20.01.1999 Original published format: NL 1011083 | [2001/01] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0043615 | Date: | 27.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064443 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E04H12/22 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
E04H12/2238 (EP,US);
E01F9/662 (EP,US);
E01F9/688 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Halten eines Lampenpfostens und deren Verwendung mit einem solchen Lampenpfosten | [2007/30] | English: | Apparatus to support a lamp post and its use with such a lamp post | [2007/30] | French: | Dispositif support pour lampadaire et son utilisation avec ledit lampadaire | [2007/31] |
Former [2001/01] | VORRICHTUNG ZUM HALTEN EINES LAMPENPFOSTENS UND EIN SOLCHER LAMPENPFOSTEN | ||
Former [2001/01] | APPARATUS TO SUPPORT A LAMP POST, AND SUCH A LAMP POST | ||
Former [2001/01] | DISPOSITIF SUPPORT POUR LAMPADAIRE ET LAMPADAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2000 | Translation filed | 19.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 22.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2004 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 19.11.2004 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 03.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/20] | 21.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.03.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   27.04.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2003 | 31.01.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   02.08.2004 | 31.01.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2741739 (COSTE GERARD [FR]) [X] 1,4 * page 6, line 4 - page 8, line 29; figure - *; | [A]GB2319385 (BEEFEATER SIGNS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 2 * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 11 * * page 7, line 9 - line 22; figure 1 *; | [A]FR1531886 (DUMAS) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0379335 (LUSSEY DAVID [GB]) | by applicant | EP0379335 |