EP1150602 - DUCTAL ORIFICE IDENTIFICATION BY CHARACTERISTIC ELECTRICAL SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CYTYC CORPORATION 250 Campus Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2006/27] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Cytyc Corporation 85 Swanson Road Boxborough, MA 01719 / US | ||
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Cytyc Health Corporation 85 Swanson Road Boxborough, MA 01719 / US | ||
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states Pro-Duct Health, Inc. 1010 Hamilton Court Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNG, David 2634 Belmont Canyon Road Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 02 /
STERN, Roger 1346 Bordeaux Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 03 /
GROSSER, Morton 1016 Lemon Street Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00903283.0 | 12.01.2000 | [2001/45] | WO2000US00857 | Priority number, date | US19990115787P | 13.01.1999 Original published format: US 115787 P | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0041618 | Date: | 20.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1150602 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1150602 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.07.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/05, A61B5/00 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
A61B5/0531 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/45] | A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/16] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IDENTIFIKATION DUKTALER ÖFFNUNGEN MITTELS CHARAKTERISTISCHEM ELEKTRISCHEN SIGNAL | [2007/32] | English: | DUCTAL ORIFICE IDENTIFICATION BY CHARACTERISTIC ELECTRICAL SIGNAL | [2001/45] | French: | IDENTIFICATION D'ORIFICES CANALAIRES PAR UN SIGNAL ELECTRIQUE CARACTERISTIQUE | [2001/45] |
Former [2001/45] | IDENTIFIKATION DUCTALER ÖFFNUNGEN MITTELS CHARAKTERISTISCHEM ELEKTRISCHEN SIGNAL | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2001 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 07.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 15.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 15.02.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 15.02.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.03.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.04.2008 | BE | 16.04.2008 | CY | 16.04.2008 | DK | 16.04.2008 | FI | 16.04.2008 | IT | 16.04.2008 | NL | 16.04.2008 | SE | 16.07.2008 | GR | 17.07.2008 | ES | 27.07.2008 | PT | 16.09.2008 | IE | 12.01.2009 | LU | 12.01.2009 | [2011/21] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
GR | 17.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
IE | 12.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
IE | 12.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
CY | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
IT | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
BE | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
NL | 16.04.2008 | ||
ES | 27.07.2008 | ||
PT | 16.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 27.07.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - PIPERNO G ET AL, "BREAST CANCER SCREENING BY IMPEDANCE MEASUREMENTS", FRONTIERS OF MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING, VSP. ZEIST, NL, (1990), vol. 2, no. 2, ISSN 0921-3775, pages 111 - 117, XP000676951 [X] 12 * page 112, lines 5-12 * * page 113, lines 9,10 * | International search | [X]US5271413 (DALAMAGAS PHOTIOS P [US], et al); | [X]US5501230 (LARIBIERE LAURENT [FR]); | [X]US5810742 (PEARLMAN ANDREW L [IL]) |