EP1145007 - SIMPLE METHOD FOR LABELED CONJUGATE PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARTEK BIOSCIENCES CORPORATION 6480 Dobbin Road Columbia, MD 21045 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Martek Biosciences Corporation 6480 Dobbin Road Columbia, MD 21045 / US | ||
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states MARTEK BIOSCIENCES CORPORATION 6480 Dobbin Road Columbia, MD 21045 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORSEMAN, John, P. 9615 Rocksparkle Row Columbia, MD 21045 / US | 02 /
ZENG, Xiangfei 407 N.W. Kotrik Place Beaverton, OR / US | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Jönsson, Hans-Peter, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2001/42] | Jönsson, Hans-Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisling Selting Werner, Deichmannhaus am Dom 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 00903358.0 | 21.01.2000 | [2001/42] | WO2000US01350 | Priority number, date | US19990116689P | 22.01.1999 Original published format: US 116689 P | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0043784 | Date: | 27.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1145007 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1145007 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/532 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
G01N33/532 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINFACHES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MARKIERTEN KONJUGATEN | [2001/42] | English: | SIMPLE METHOD FOR LABELED CONJUGATE PRODUCTION | [2001/42] | French: | PROCEDE SIMPLE DE PRODUCTION DE CONJUGUES MARQUES | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 01.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.2004 | BE | 29.12.2004 | FI | 29.12.2004 | IT | 29.12.2004 | NL | 29.12.2004 | CY | 21.01.2005 | IE | 21.01.2005 | LU | 21.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | DK | 29.03.2005 | GR | 29.03.2005 | SE | 29.03.2005 | ES | 09.04.2005 | PT | 29.05.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
IT | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
CY | 21.01.2005 | ||
IE | 21.01.2005 | ||
LU | 21.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
CY | 21.01.2005 | ||
IE | 21.01.2005 | ||
LU | 21.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
IE | 21.01.2005 | ||
LU | 21.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
IE | 21.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
ES | 09.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 29.12.2004 | |
GR | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 29.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9727885 (LEE JOHN MICHAEL [CA]); | [DA] - P. DAGENAIS ET AL., "Direct covalent attachment of small peptide antigens to enzyme-linked immunosorbent assay plates using radiation and carbodiimide activation.", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY., ACADEMIC PRESS INC. NEW YORK., US, (199410), vol. 222, no. 1, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 149 - 155, XP002138318 [DA] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1994.1466 | [A] - M. R. LEWIS ET AL., "A facile, water-soluble method for modification of proteins with DOTA. Use of elevated temperature and optimized pH to achieve high specific activity and high chelate stability in radiolabeled immunoconjugates.", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON., US, (1994), vol. 5, no. 6, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 565 - 576, XP002138319 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc00030a012 | [A] - M. K. GHOSH ET AL., "Preparation and characterization of methotrexate-immunoglobulin conjugates.", DRUG DESIGN AND DELIVERY., HARWOOD ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS GMBH., XX, (1989), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 13 - 25, XP000910702 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - Z. HAN ET AL., "Covalent coupling of papain and N-hydroxysuccinimide esters of crosslinked agarose.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19901119), vol. 113, no. 21, Database accession no. 187238, page 325, column 2, XP002138321 [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [ ] - SHENGWU GONGCHENG XUEBAO, (1990), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 76 - 80 |