EP1150627 - AN OSTOMY PLUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coloplast A/S Holtedam 1 3050 Humlebaek / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states COLOPLAST A/S Holtedam 1 3050 Humlebaek / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIELSEN, Inger, Mann Vagtelvej 78 DK-2000 Frederiksberg C / DK | 02 /
SLETTEN, Carsten Dronningens Tvaergade 27,1. door No.2 DK-1302 Copenhagen K / DK | 03 /
VON BÜLOW, Martin Ndr. Strandvey 69 DK-3000 Helsinger / DK | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Nilausen, Kim, et al c/o Coloplast A/S Holtedam 1 3050 Humlebaek / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Nilausen, Kim, et al c/o Coloplast A/S, Holtedam 1 3050 Humlebaek / DK | Application number, filing date | 00903559.3 | 10.02.2000 | [2001/45] | WO2000DK00056 | Priority number, date | DK19990000182 | 10.02.1999 Original published format: DK 18299 | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0047143 | Date: | 17.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1150627 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1150627 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/44, // A61L28:00 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
A61F2/0009 (EP,US);
A61F5/4407 (EP,US);
A61L28/0049 (EP,US);
A61L28/0053 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/15] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OSTOMIESTÖPSEL | [2001/45] | English: | AN OSTOMY PLUG | [2001/45] | French: | BOUCHON DE STOMIE | [2001/45] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 01.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.04.2004 | BE | 07.04.2004 | CH | 07.04.2004 | FI | 07.04.2004 | LI | 07.04.2004 | GR | 07.07.2004 | PT | 07.09.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2005/14] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
BE | 07.04.2004 | ||
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 07.04.2004 | |
CH | 07.04.2004 | ||
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
GR | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
FI | 07.04.2004 | ||
LI | 07.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 07.04.2004 | |
LI | 07.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0188376 (COLOPLAST AS [DK]) [A] 1-10; | [A]US4979947 (BERMAN IRWIN R [US]) [A] 1-10; | [A]US5531716 (LUZIO GARY A [US], et al)[A] 1,9 |