EP1144603 - PROTEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEMOREC Stoffel GmbH-Medizinisch-Molekulare Entwicklung, Köln Stöckheimer Weg 1 50829 Köln / DE | [2002/38] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Memorec Medical Molecular Research Cologne Stoffel GmbH Stöckheimer Weg 1 50829 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Memorec Medical Molecular Research Cologne Stoffel GmbH Stöckheimer Weg 1 50829 Köln / DE | ||
For all designated states Hofmann, Kay Ehrenfeldgürtel 139 50823 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFMANN, Kay Ehrenfeldgürtel 139 D-50823 Köln / DE | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2001/42] | Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 00903587.4 | 19.01.2000 | [2001/42] | WO2000EP00390 | Priority number, date | DE1999102550 | 22.01.1999 Original published format: DE 19902550 | DE1999125946 | 08.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19925946 | DE1999129115 | 24.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19929115 | [2001/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0043505 | Date: | 27.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1144603 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/64, C07K16/40, A61K38/48, A61K48/00, A61K39/395, G01N33/53, C12Q1/68, C12N5/10, C07K14/47 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
C12N9/6478 (EP);
C12N9/50 (EP,US);
C12Q1/37 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/42] | C12N9/64, C07K16/40, A61K38/48, A61K48/00, A61K39/395, G01N33/53, C12Q1/68, C12N5/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Title | German: | PROTEASE MIT ZWEI ASPARTATRESTEN IN DER KATALYTISCH AKTIVEN STRUKTUR | [2001/42] | English: | PROTEASE | [2001/42] | French: | PROTEASE | [2001/42] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2001/42: Derzeit sind die WIPO-Publikationsdaten A3 nicht verfügbar. | EPB 2001/42: WIPO A3 publication data is not currently available. | EPB 2001/42: L'OMPI données de publication A3 ne sont pas actuellement disponibles. | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 03.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/09] | 06.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9833916 (GENETICS INST [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6-9 * page 14, line 5 - page 15, line 24 * * page 25, line 5 - page 26, line 2 * * page 36, lines 23-25 * * page 48, lines 18-30 * * page 55, lines 16-19 * * Clone CS752_3 (SEQ ID NO:16) *; | [X]WO9840404 (GENETICS INST [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * page 7, line 9 - page 8, line 34 * * page 24, line 5 - page 25, line 11 * * page 51, lines 22-27 * * page 58, lines 16-19 * * page 61, lines 33,34 * * clone bk291_3 (SEQ ID NO:7) *; | [PX]WO9903990 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-4,6,8,9 * page 24, lines 5-35 * * page 110, lines 12-22 * * gene 21 SEQ ID NOs: 31, 103 *; | [PX]WO9933873 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [PX] 1-4,6,8,9; | [PX]WO9943693 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-4,6-8 * page 27, line 15 - page 29, line 21 * * page 66 * * page 80, line 32 - page 81, line 31 * * SEQ ID NOs: 1,62,106 *; | [E]WO0017222 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [E] 1-4,6,8,9 * page 71, line 28 - page 75, line 11 * * page 114, lines 11-13 * * page 178, lines 15-27 ** SEQ ID NOs:25,128 *; | EP1043333 [ ] (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0092] * * paragraphs [0121] - [0124] *; | [X] - LAMERDIN ET AL, "FOS39554_1", GENEMBL, (19980801), XP002141740 [X] 1-4,6-8 * Accession No. O60365 * | [X] - HILLIER ET AL., "zc51b02.r1 Soares senescentr fibroblasts NbHSF Homo sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:325803", GENEMBL, (19960808), XP002157596 [X] 1-4,6,8 * Accession A037159 * |