|
29.11.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2006 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Reply to communication about intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.03.2005 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
28.02.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2005 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
28.02.2005 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.02.2005 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2005 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2005 |
Communication concerning missing translation(s) of priority document(s) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2005 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Communication concerning missing translation(s) of priority document(s) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2004 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.01.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
19.10.2001 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2001 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.07.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.07.2001 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
09.07.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
09.05.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.05.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.05.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.05.2001 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Abstract |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Abstract |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Drawings |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Drawings |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.04.2001 |
Abstract |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.04.2001 |
Abstract |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.04.2001 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.04.2001 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.04.2001 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
03.04.2001 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
03.04.2001 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - drawings |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.04.2001 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - drawings |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.04.2001 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Sequence listing |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.01.2001 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
31.01.2001 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
31.01.2001 |
Drawings |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
31.01.2001 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
31.10.2000 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.10.2000 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
31.10.2000 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
24.08.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
86 |
|
21.08.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.08.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.08.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
07.08.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.08.2000 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.07.2000 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.07.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.07.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
9 |