EP1162929 - COMPACT DOSAGE UNIT FOR BUCCAL ADMINISTRATION OF A PHARMACOLOGICALLY ACTIVE AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Place, Virgil A. 10 Ala Kahua, P.O. Box 44555 Kawaihae, HI 96743 / US | [2001/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00904484.3 | 21.01.2000 | [2001/51] | WO2000US01534 | Priority number, date | US19990236892 | 26.01.1999 Original published format: US 236892 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0042959 | Date: | 27.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1162929 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.07.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/00, A61K9/22 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/568 (EP,US);
A61K9/0056 (EP,US);
A61K9/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMPAKTE EINZELDOSIERUNG ZUR BUKKALEN VERABREICHUNG EINES PHARMAKOLOGISCH WIRKSAMEN STOFFES | [2001/51] | English: | COMPACT DOSAGE UNIT FOR BUCCAL ADMINISTRATION OF A PHARMACOLOGICALLY ACTIVE AGENT | [2001/51] | French: | UNITE POSOLOGIQUE COMPACTE POUR ADMINISTRATION ORALE DE PRINCIPE ACTIF PHARMACOLOGIQUE | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2001 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 07.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/21] | 28.06.2004 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/21] | Appeal following examination | 17.08.2004 | Appeal received No. T1353/04 | 15.02.2005 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant inadmissible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5458884 (BRITTON PETER [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11,24,30 * abstract * * claims 1,2,5 * * column 6, line 42 * * examples 2,3 *; | [Y]US5855905 (OETTEL MICHAEL [DE], et al) [Y] 24-29 * abstract * * column 1, line 54 - line 55 * * claims 1,2,4 *; | [XY]US5004601 (SNIPES WALLACE C [US]) [X] 23 * example 2 * [Y] 1,14,15,22; | [YD]US4764378 (KEITH ALEC D [US], et al) [YD] 31-35 * column 5, line 51 - line 55 * * claim 23 * | [XY] - VOORSPOELS J ET AL, "BUCCAL ABSORPTION OF TESTOSTERONE AND ITS ESTERS USING A BIOADHESIVE TABLET IN DOGS", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199608), vol. 13, no. 8, ISSN 0724-8741, pages 1228 - 1232, XP000865566 [X] 1,4-11,13-18,22-26,30 * abstract * * page 1228, column 2, paragraphs 3,4 * * page 1230, column 2 * * page 1231, column 1, paragraph 1 * * tables II,III * * figure 3 * [Y] 1,14,15,22,24-29,31-35 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1016072522151 | International search | [X]US4755386 (HSIAO CHIIN H [US], et al); | [X]US5053032 (BARCLAY BRIAN L [US], et al) | [Y] - BHASIN S. ET AL., "Emerging issues in androgen replacement therapy", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (1997), vol. 82, no. 1, pages 3 - 8, XP002927166 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/jc.82.1.3 |