Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2662000 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19900197 | 06.01.1999 | EP0000033 | 05.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1148855 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19900197 | 06.01.1999 | EP0000033 | 05.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2365748 | 28.06.2005 | C | CA2365748 | 13.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19900197 | 06.01.1999 | EP0000033 | 05.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6692146 | 17.02.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE19900197 | 06.01.1999 | EP0000033 | 05.01.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0040187 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19900197 | 06.01.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19900197 | 23.05.2001 | C2 | DE19900197 | 10.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19900197 | 06.01.1999 |