EP1149146 - USE OF PHOSPHONOUS ACID MODIFIED POLYACRYLATES AS SEQUESTERING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2001/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENDOZA CRUZ, Mercedes c/Mallorca, 499-503, 1-6a E-08013 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
ARRANZ, Adolf Valencia, 568, 3rd E-08026 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
DE JORGE, Elisabet c/Massen Cinto Verdaguer, 3, 3 o , 1a E-0880 Vilanova i la Geltu / ES | [2001/44] | Application number, filing date | 00904959.4 | 25.01.2000 | [2001/44] | WO2000EP00533 | Priority number, date | DE1999104230 | 04.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19904230 | [2001/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0046328 | Date: | 10.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1149146 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1149146 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/395, C11D3/37, C11D3/36 | [2001/44] | CPC: |
C11D3/3784 (EP);
C11D3/3956 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT [2004/36] |
Former [2001/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON PHOSPHONSÄURE-MODIFIZIERTEN POLYACRYLATEN ALS SEQUESTRIERMITTEL | [2001/44] | English: | USE OF PHOSPHONOUS ACID MODIFIED POLYACRYLATES AS SEQUESTERING AGENTS | [2001/44] | French: | UTILISATION DE POLYACRYLATES MODIFIES A L'ACIDE PHOSPHONIQUE EN TANT QUE SEQUESTRANTS | [2001/44] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/44] | 18.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9830671 (HENKEL KGAA) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]JPH07109107 ; | [A]DE4333100 (HENKEL KGAA) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9844082 (S C JOHNSON & SON INC) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP0824147 (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 46 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 25, Database accession no. 1995-190679, XP002901060 & JPH07109107 A 19950425 (NIPPON PEROXIDE CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | Examination | WO0011128 | EP1001011 |