EP1173628 - IRON-NICKEL ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp VDM GmbH Plettenberger Strasse 2 58791 Werdohl / DE | [2002/41] |
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states Krupp VDM GmbH Plettenberger Strasse 2 58791 Werdohl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEHRMANN, Bodo Ahornweg 16 D-58840 Plettenberg / DE | [2002/04] | Application number, filing date | 00905008.9 | 02.02.2000 | [2002/04] | WO2000EP00840 | Priority number, date | DE1999120144 | 03.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19920144 | [2002/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0066802 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1173628 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1173628 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/52 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
C22C38/105 (EP);
C22C38/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/39] |
Former [2002/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | EISEN-NICKEL-LEGIERUNG | [2002/04] | English: | IRON-NICKEL ALLOY | [2002/04] | French: | ALLIAGE FER-NICKEL | [2002/04] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 15.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXA]JPH06336655 ; | [XA]EP0567989 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,4 * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 14; example C1; table 1 * [A] 5-7; | [X]EP0713923 (IMPHY SA [FR]) [X] 1,4 * column 3, line 9 - line 16; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US5811918 (VAN DEN BERG ADRIANUS H M [NL], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 1 - line 48 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 55 *; | [DXA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950428), vol. 1995, no. 03, & JP06336655 A 19941206 (NKK CORP) [DX] 1-4 * abstract * * page 6; example 10; table 1 * [A] 5-7 | [A] - LEE, J. H. ET AL, "Effects of manganese, chromium and cobalt on the thermal expansion behaviors of iron-nickel Invar alloys", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940321), vol. 120, no. 12, Database accession no. 140352, XP002137903 [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [ ] - TAEHAN KUMSOK HAKHOECHI (1993), 31(7), 867-872 |