|
08.02.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
21.08.2017 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.08.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.08.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
24.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.08.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
24.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.08.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
24.08.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
25.11.2011 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.03.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.09.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2003 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2002 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2002 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2001 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2001 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.09.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
26.09.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.09.2001 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2001 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.09.2001 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.2001 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.09.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.08.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.08.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
37 |