EP1140430 - WELDING FIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swagelok Company 29500 Solon Road Solon, OH 44139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Swagelok Company 29500 Solon Road Solon, OH 44139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WUERTZ, William, J. 4872 Countryside Road Lyndhurst, OH 44124 / US | 02 /
FISHER, Ronald, K., Jr. 3456 Porter Road Rootstown, OH 44272 / US | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00905552.6 | 06.01.2000 | [2001/41] | WO2000US00302 | Priority number, date | US19990114999P | 06.01.1999 Original published format: US 114999 P | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0040373 | Date: | 13.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1140430 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1140430 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B25B5/00 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
B23K37/0426 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17881 (EP,US);
Y10T279/26 (EP,US);
Y10T279/33 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Title | German: | SCHWEISSANSCHLUSSSTÜCK | [2001/41] | English: | WELDING FIXTURE | [2001/41] | French: | BATI DE SOUDAGE | [2001/41] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2003/37: Derzeit sind die WIPO-Publikationsdaten A3 nicht verfügbar. | EPB 2003/37: WIPO A3 publication data is not currently available. | EPB 2003/37: L'OMPI données de publication A3 ne sont pas actuellement disponibles. | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 03.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.09.2003 | BE | 10.09.2003 | CY | 10.09.2003 | FI | 10.09.2003 | NL | 10.09.2003 | DK | 10.12.2003 | GR | 10.12.2003 | SE | 10.12.2003 | PT | 19.12.2003 | LU | 06.01.2004 | ES | 07.01.2004 | MC | 31.01.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/12] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
BE | 10.09.2003 | ||
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
DK | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
PT | 19.12.2003 | ||
LU | 06.01.2004 | ||
ES | 07.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
BE | 10.09.2003 | ||
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
DK | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
PT | 19.12.2003 | ||
LU | 06.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
BE | 10.09.2003 | ||
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
DK | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
PT | 19.12.2003 | ||
MC | 31.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
BE | 10.09.2003 | ||
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
DK | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
PT | 19.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
BE | 10.09.2003 | ||
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
PT | 19.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
BE | 10.09.2003 | ||
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 10.09.2003 | |
NL | 10.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 10.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3813512 (NORDGREN A) [A] 1,2,9,11 * column 2, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4; figure 1 *; | [A]US4601448 (MIYAZAKI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,5* abstract;; figure 6 *; | [A]DE8623208U (BOLZENSCHWEISSTECHNIK HEINZ SOYER GMBH) [A] 1,5,7,8 * figure .; claim . *; | [A]FR2585441 (MARTIN ROGER [FR]) [A] 1,2,9,11 * page 3, paragraph 2 - line 31; figures 1,2 * |