EP1150714 - METHODS FOR INHIBITING BRAIN TUMOR GROWTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHILDRENS HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES 4650 Sunset Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90027 / US | [2008/21] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states CHILDRENS HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES 4650 Sunset Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUG, Walter, E. 2329 Panorama Drive La Crescenta, CA 91214 / US | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Schnappauf, Georg, et al ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | Schnappauf, Georg, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/45] | Grund, Martin, Dr., et al Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei, Holbeinstrasse 5 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00905742.3 | 26.01.2000 | [2001/45] | WO2000US01949 | Priority number, date | US19990118126P | 01.02.1999 Original published format: US 118126 P | US20000489391 | 21.01.2000 Original published format: US 489391 | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0044404 | Date: | 03.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1150714 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1150714 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K38/39 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
A61K38/39 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/2839 (EP,US);
C07K16/2848 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/21] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | 31.08.2001 | LT | 31.08.2001 | LV | 31.08.2001 | MK | 31.08.2001 | RO | 31.08.2001 | SI | 31.08.2001 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR INHIBIERUNG VON GEHIRNTUMORWACHSTUM DURCH VERWENDUNG VON ANTAGONISTEN VON INTEGRINEN | [2001/45] | English: | METHODS FOR INHIBITING BRAIN TUMOR GROWTH | [2001/45] | French: | PROCEDES D'INHIBITION DE LA CROISSANCE DE TUMEURS CEREBRALES | [2001/45] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.02.2009
23.04.2009
ADMISSIBLE Centocor Ortho Biotech Inc. 800/850 Ridgeview Drive Horsham, PA 19044 / US Opponent's representative Marshall, Cameron John Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.02.2009
23.04.2009
ADMISSIBLE Centocor Ortho Biotech Inc. 800/850 Ridgeview Drive Horsham, PA 19044 / US Opponent's representative Marshall, Cameron John Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.02.2009
23.04.2009
ADMISSIBLE Centocor 200 Great Valley Parkway Malvern, PA 19355 / US Opponent's representative Marshall, Cameron John Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.02.2009
Centocor 200 Great Valley Parkway Malvern, PA 19355 / US Opponent's representative Marshall, Cameron John Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | 06.05.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.11.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.11.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.12.2010 | 06.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.12.2010 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 27.12.2010 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2011/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.05.2008 | MC | 31.01.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2009/37] | MC | 31.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X] - D R FRIEDLANDER ET AL., "Migration of brain tumor cells on extracellular matrix proteins in vitro correlates with tumor type and grade and involves alphaV and beta1 integrins", CANCER RESEARCH, MD US, (19960415), vol. 56, pages 1939 - 1947, XP002141914 [X] 1-3,7,11-15,17-19,22-26 * the whole document * | [X] - File Medline, abstract no. 95105899, 1995, XP002141917 [X] 1-3,7,11-15,17-19,22-26 | [ ] - A PA AMAR ET AL., "Development of an in vitro extracellular matrix assay for studies of brain tumor cell invasion", JOURNAL OF NEURO-ONCOLOGY, (1994), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 1 - 15 [ ] * abstract * | [X] - File Medline, abstract 94157639, 1994, XP002141918 [X] 1-3,7,11-15,17-19,22-26 | [ ] - W PAULUS & J C TONN, "Basement membrane invasion of glioma cells mediated by integrin receptors", JOURNAL OF NEUROSURGERY, (199403), vol. 80, no. 3, pages 515 - 519 [ ] * abstract * | [X] - File Medline, abstract 97093660, 1997, XP002141919 [X] 1-3,7,11-15,17-19,22-26 | [ ] - C L GLADSON, "Expression of integrin alphaV beta3 in small blood vessels of glioblastoma tumors", JOURNAL OF NEUROPATHOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL NEUROLOGY, (199611), vol. 55, no. 11, pages 1143 - 1149 [ ] * abstract * | [X] - File Medline, abstract 1998369538, 1998, XP002141920 [X] 1-3,7,11-15,17-19,22-26 | [ ] - J C TONN ET AL., "Invasive behaviour of human gliomas is mediated by interindividually different integrin patterns", ANTICANCER RESEARCH, (199807), vol. 8, no. 4A, pages 2599 - 2605 [ ] * abstract * | [X] - File Medline, abstract 1998396970, 1998, XP002141921 [X] 1-3,7,11-15,17-19,22-26 | [ ] - S TREASURYWALA & M E BERENS, "Mgration arrest in glioma cells is dependent on the alphaV integrin subunit", GLIA, (199810), vol. 24, no. 2, pages 236 - 243 [ ] * abstract * | [X] - T J MACDONALD ET AL., "Migration of human brain tumor cells and human brain endothelial cells on tenascin requires the integrin alphaVbeta3; a unifying model for brain tumor invasion and angiogenesis", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL, (199803), vol. 39, page 497, XP002141915 [X] 1-3,7,11-15,17-19,22-26 * see abstract no. 3382 * | [PX] - T J MACDONALD ET AL., "Antagonist to alphaV-integrin inhibits frowth of orthotopically but not heterotopically transplanted brain tumors", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL, (199903), vol. 40, page 621, XP002141916 [PX] 1-28 * see abstract no. 4096 * | Examination | EP0770622 |