EP1156820 - USE OF VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR-2 (VEGF-2) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/48] | VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR-2 | ||
[2007/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES, INC. 14200 Shady Grove Road Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2008/27] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES, INC. 9410 Key West Avenue Rockville, MD 20850-3338 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSEN, Craig, A. 22400 Rolling Hill Road Laytonsville, MD 20882 / US | 02 /
ALDERSON, Ralph 12125 Orchard View Road Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | 03 /
MELDER, Robert 921 Beacon Square Court, No. 254 Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | 04 /
ROSCHKE, Viktor 13844 Lambertina Place Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 05 /
RUBEN, Steven, M. 18528 Heritage Hills Drive Olney, MD 20832 / US | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/48] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00905992.4 | 07.02.2000 | [2001/48] | WO2000US03047 | Priority number, date | US19990119179P | 08.02.1999 Original published format: US 119179 P | US19990119926P | 12.02.1999 Original published format: US 119926 P | US19990137796P | 03.06.1999 Original published format: US 137796 P | US19990171505P | 22.12.1999 Original published format: US 171505 P | [2001/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0045835 | Date: | 10.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1156820 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1156820 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/18, A61K39/395, C07K16/00, C07K16/22, A61K38/19, A61P27/02 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
C07K14/52 (EP);
A61K38/18 (KR);
A61K38/1866 (EP);
A61K48/005 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K16/22 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2001/48] | A61K38/18, A61K39/395, C07K16/00, C07K16/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VOM VASKULÄREN ENDOTHELIALEN WACHSTUMSFAKTOR 2 (VEGF-2) | [2007/50] | English: | USE OF VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR-2 (VEGF-2) | [2007/50] | French: | UTILISATION DU FACTEUR-2 DE CROISSANCE ENDOTHELIALE VASCULAIRE (VEGF-2) | [2007/50] |
Former [2001/48] | VASKULÄRER ENDOTHELIALER WACHSTUMSFAKTOR 2 | ||
Former [2001/48] | VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR-2 | ||
Former [2001/48] | FACTEUR-2 DE CROISSANCE ENDOTHELIALE VASCULAIRE | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.09.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 25.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08153873.8 / EP1985632 | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.07.2008 | BE | 09.07.2008 | CY | 09.07.2008 | DK | 09.07.2008 | FI | 09.07.2008 | IT | 09.07.2008 | NL | 09.07.2008 | SE | 09.10.2008 | GR | 10.10.2008 | ES | 20.10.2008 | PT | 09.12.2008 | LU | 07.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
GR | 10.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
LU | 07.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
GR | 10.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IT | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
BE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 09.07.2008 | |
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 09.07.2008 | |
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9524473 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US]) [X] 19-21 * page 16, paragraph L - page 18, line L; claim - * * page 22, paragraph L - page 24, paragraph 1 *; | [A]WO9719694 (AMGEN INC [US]) [A] 1-31 * claim - *; | [DA] - YANG XIANJIE ET AL, "Flk-1, a receptor for vascular endothelial growth factor (VEGF), is expressed by retinal progenitor cells", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (1996), vol. 16, no. 19, ISSN 0270-6474, pages 6089 - 6099, XP008037730 [DA] 1-31 * page 6090, column L, paragraph 3 * | [A] - GERHARDINGER C ET AL, "EXPRESSION OF VASCULAR ENDOTHELIAL GROWTH FACTOR IN THE HUMAN RETINA AND IN NONPROLIFERATIVE DIABETIC RETINOPATHY", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (199806), vol. 152, no. 6, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 1453 - 1462, XP000891412 [A] 1-31 * page 1459, column R, line 26 - line 40 * | [PX] - YOUREY PAMELA A ET AL, "Vascular endothelial cell growth factors promote the in vitro development of rat photoreceptor cells", MOLECULAR BIOLOGY OF THE CELL, & 39TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR CELL BIOLOGY; WASHINGTON, D.C., USA; DECEMBER 11-15, 1999, (199911), vol. 10, no. SUPPL., ISSN 1059-1524, page 39a, XP008037694 [PX] 1-17 * abstract 227 * | [T] - YOUREY PAMELA A ET AL, "Vascular endothelial cell growth factors promote the in vitro development of rat photoreceptor cells", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (20000915), vol. 20, no. 18, ISSN 0270-6474, pages 6781 - 6788, XP002303284 [T] 1-17 * the whole document * | International search | [AP]US5932540 (HU JING-SHAN [US], et al) |