EP1154861 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR HANDLING MAGNETIC PARTICLES IN A FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE Pacific Northwest Laboratories Intellectual Property Services 902 Battelle Boulevard P.O. Box 999 Richland, WA 99352 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE Pacific Northwest Division, Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 999 Richland, WA 99352 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLMAN, David, A. 1900 Stevens Drive, 419 Richland, WA 99352 / US | 02 /
GRATE, Jay, W. P.O. Box 4137 West Richland, WA 99353 / US | 03 /
BRUCKNER-LEA, Cynthia, J. 144 Mountain View Lane Richland, WA 99352 / US | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Brown, Fraser Gregory James, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | Brown, Fraser Gregory James, et al fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00906021.1 | 08.02.2000 | [2001/47] | WO2000US03432 | Priority number, date | US19990255758 | 23.02.1999 Original published format: US 255758 | [2001/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0050175 | Date: | 31.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1154861 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B03C1/033, B03C1/034 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
B03C1/033 (EP,US);
B03C1/034 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/47] | Title | German: | APPARAT UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MAGNETISCHEN TEILCHEN IN EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2001/47] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR HANDLING MAGNETIC PARTICLES IN A FLUID | [2001/47] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE MANIPULATION DE PARTICULES MAGNETIQUES PRESENTES DANS UN FLUIDE | [2001/47] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 01.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/11] | 10.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2015900 (INOUE JAPAX RES) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10,12,13,16-18 * page 2, line 38 - line 99; figure 1; example 1; claims 4-8 *; | [X]EP0318913 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 20,22 * page 5, line 6 - line 14; figure 7; claims 1-3 * |