blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1156813

EP1156813 - REOVIRUS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CELLULAR PROLIFERATIVE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.05.2009
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 25.05.2011  [2011/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oncolytics Biotech Inc.
Suite 210 1167 Kensington Crescent N. W.
Calgary, AB T2N 1X7 / CA
[2008/28]
Former [2005/43]For all designated states
Oncolytics Biotech Inc.
Suite 210 1167 Kensington Crescent N. W.
Calgary, AB T2N 1X7 / CA
Former [2004/31]For all designated states
Oncolytics Biotech, Inc.
Suite 210, 1167 Kensigton Crescent N.W.
Calgary, Alberta T2N 1X7 / CA
Former [2001/48]For all designated states
Oncolytics Biotech, Inc.
301, 1211 Kensington Road N.W.
Calgary, Alberta T2N 3P6 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Patrick, W., K.
22 Varmoor Place, N.W.
Calgary, Alberta T3A 0A1 / CA
02 / STRONG, James
5071 Nesbitt Road N.W.
Calgary, Alberta T2K 2N6 / CA
03 / COFFEY, Matthew, C.
2231 Bowness Road N.W.
Calgary, Alberta T2N 3L4 / CA
 [2002/07]
Former [2002/01]01 / LEE, Patrick, W., K.
22 Varmoor Place, N.W.
Calgary, Alberta T3A 0A1 / CA
02 / STRONG, James
5071 Nesbitt Road N.W.
Calgary, Alberta T2K 2N6 / CA
03 / COFFEY, Matthew, C.
2241 Bowness Road N.W.
Calgary, Alberta T2N 3L4 / CA
Former [2001/48]01 / LEE, Patrick, W., K.
22 Varmoor Place, N.W.
Calgary, Alberta T3A 0A1 / CA
02 / STRONG, James
5071 Nesbitt Road N.W.
Calgary, Alberta T2K 2N6 / CA
03 / COFFEY, Matthew, C.
408, 1111 13th Avenue S.W.
Calgary, Alberta T2R 0L7 / CA
Representative(s)Barth, Renate, et al
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/25]Barth, Renate, et al
Vossius & Partner Siebertstr. 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2001/48]Senior, Janet, et al
Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
Application number, filing date00906094.818.02.2000
[2001/48]
WO2000CA00178
Priority number, dateUS1999025682424.02.1999         Original published format: US 256824
[2001/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO0050051
Date:31.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/35]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1156813
Date:28.11.2001
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2001/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1156813
Date:09.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.12.2000
ClassificationIPC:A61K35/76, A61P35/00
[2001/48]
CPC:
A61K9/0019 (EP,US); A61K35/765 (EP,US); A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP); A61P35/02 (EP); A61P35/04 (EP);
C12N2720/12032 (EP,US); C12N2720/12232 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:REOVIRUS ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ZELLULÄREN PROLIFERATIVEN ERKRANKUNGEN[2008/28]
English:REOVIRUS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CELLULAR PROLIFERATIVE DISORDERS[2001/48]
French:REOVIRUS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES CELLULAIRES PROLIFERANTS[2001/48]
Former [2001/48]REOVIRUS ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER ZELLULÄREN PROLIFERATIVEN ERKRANKUNGEN
Entry into regional phase24.09.2001National basic fee paid 
24.09.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
24.09.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/51]
10.02.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2008Fee for grant paid
19.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP08153408.3  / EP1949905
Opposition(s)14.04.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
27.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LU18.02.2009
BE28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
[2011/21]
Former [2010/30]AT18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
BE28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2010/10]CY18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
BE28.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2010/07]CY18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2010/04]CY18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2009/49]FI18.02.2009
MC28.02.2009
Former [2009/42]MC28.02.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9716443  (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [A] 16,17 * page 16, line 37 - page 17, line 14 *;
 [A]WO9808541  (GENZYME CORP [US], et al) [A] 22-24,31,32,39,40,42 * page 2, line 9 - line 23 * * page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 18 *;
 [PX]WO9908692  (LEE PATRICK W K [CA], et al) [PX] 1-11,13-22,25-29,31-35,39,40 * page 3, line 2 - line 14 * * page 8, line 15 - page 9, line 20 ** page 34, line 9 - page 35, line 8; claims 1-29 *;
 [XY]  - COFFEY MATTHEW C ET AL, "Reovirus therapy of tumors with activated Ras pathway.", SCIENCE (WASHINGTON D C), (19981113), vol. 282, no. 5392, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1332 - 1334, XP002145200 [X] 1-29,31,33-37,39,40,42 * page 1332, paragraph 6 - page 1333, paragraph 2 * * page 1333, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 1333, paragraph 5 * * page 1334, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * [Y] 30,32,38,41

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.282.5392.1332
 [DY]  - CHANDRAN KARTIK ET AL, "Protease cleavage of reovirus capsid protein mu1/mu1C is blocked by alkyl sulfate detergents, yielding a new type of infectious subvirion particle.", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (199801), vol. 72, no. 1, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 467 - 475, XP002145201 [DY] 32 * page 467 * * abstract *
 [Y]  - HALL-JACKSON C A ET AL, "Induction of cell death by stimulation of protein kinase C in human epithelial cells expressing a mutant ras oncogene: A potential therapeutic target.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, (1998), vol. 78, no. 5, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 641 - 651, XP000929837 [Y] 30,38,41 * page 641 * * abstract *
 [A]  - BOLLAG GIDEON ET AL, "Loss of NF1 results in activation of the Ras signaling pathway and leads to aberrant growth in haematopoietic cells.", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1996), Database accession no. PREV199698698068, XP002145203 [A] 12 * abstract *
    [ ] - NATURE GENETICS, (1996), vol. 12, no. 2, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 144 - 148
 [A]  - J E STRONG ET AL, "THE MOLECULAR BASIS OF VIRAL ONCOLYSIS: USURPATION OF THE Ras SIGNALING PATHWAY BY REOVIRUS", EMBO JOURNAL,GB,OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, (19980615), vol. 17, no. 12, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 3351 - 3362, XP002084840

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/17.12.3351
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.