EP1187727 - RECORDING MEDIUM WITH COLOURED IMAGE INFORMATION AND METHOD OF PRODUCING A RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Revocation of patent | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trüb AG Hintere Bahnhofstrasse 12 CH-5001 Aarau / CH | [2002/23] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states Trüb AG Aarau Hintere Bahnhofstrasse 12 CH-5001 Aarau / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTEN, Paul Girixweg 42 CH-5000 Aarau / CH | 02 /
HOFSTETTER, Stephan, D. Unterweg 1 CH-5015 Niedererlinsbach / CH | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 00906138.3 | 09.03.2000 | [2002/12] | WO2000CH00138 | Priority number, date | CH19990000989 | 27.05.1999 Original published format: CH 98999 | CH19990001501 | 17.08.1999 Original published format: CH 150199 | [2002/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0073088 | Date: | 07.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1187727 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1187727 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/10 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
B42D25/47 (EP,US);
B42D25/00 (EP,US);
B42D25/23 (US);
B42D25/41 (EP,US);
B42D2033/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/12] | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSTRÄGER MIT FARBIGEN BILDINFORMATIONEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES AUFZEICHNUNGSTRÄGERS | [2002/12] | English: | RECORDING MEDIUM WITH COLOURED IMAGE INFORMATION AND METHOD OF PRODUCING A RECORDING MEDIUM | [2002/12] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT DOTE DE DONNEES IMAGES EN COULEURS ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN TEL SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2002/12] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 20.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.03.2004
06.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstr. 159 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker, Hans-Friedrich Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.03.2004
06.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstr. 159 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker, Hans-Friedrich Patentanwälte Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.03.2004
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstr. 159 81677 München / DE | 15.04.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.10.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.01.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.03.2006 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.03.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.11.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/08] | 19.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 11.05.2006 | Appeal received No. T0754/06 | 07.07.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.11.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 10.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.11.2008 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.06.2003 | IE | 04.06.2003 | DK | 04.09.2003 | LU | 09.03.2004 | MC | 31.03.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/23] | IE | 04.06.2003 | |
DK | 04.09.2003 | ||
LU | 09.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | IE | 04.06.2003 | |
DK | 04.09.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | IE | 04.06.2003 | |
DK | 04.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | IE | 04.06.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0430282 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG [DE]) [A] 1,14 * column 5, line 25 - column 7, line 46; figures 1-5 *; | [A]GB2250951 (MCCORQUODALE SECURITY CARDS LI [GB]) [A] 1,14 * page 5, line 2 - page 8, line 20; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]DE4134539 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG [DE]) [AD] 1,14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9819870 (SETEC OY [FI]) [A] 1,14* page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 14; figures 1-5 * |