EP1144359 - PREPARATION OF AMINOCARBOXYLIC ACIDS BY OXIDATION OF PRIMARY AMINO-ALCOHOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [2001/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEBENHAAR, Bernd Obere Dorfstrasse 18 D-79400 Kandern-Wollbach / DE | 02 /
RUSEK, Milos Tiefengrabenstrasse 49 CH-4102 Binningen / CH | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Bastian, Werner Maria, et al Syngenta Participations AG Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Bastian, Werner Maria, et al Syngenta Participations AG, Intellectual Property, P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 00906215.9 | 20.01.2000 | [2001/42] | WO2000EP00434 | Priority number, date | CH19990000127 | 22.01.1999 Original published format: CH 12799 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0043351 | Date: | 27.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1144359 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C227/02, B01J23/00, B01J23/86, B01J23/80 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
C07C227/02 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/005 (EP,US);
B01J23/80 (EP,US);
B01J23/868 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C227/02, C07C229/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AMINOSÄUREN DURCH OXIDATION PRIMÄRER AINOALKOHOLE | [2001/42] | English: | PREPARATION OF AMINOCARBOXYLIC ACIDS BY OXIDATION OF PRIMARY AMINO-ALCOHOLS | [2001/42] | French: | PREPARATION D'ACIDES AMINOCARBOXYLIQUES PAR OXYDATION D'AMINO-ALCOOLS PRIMAIRES | [2001/42] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 31.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/38] | 17.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0620209 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 4; examples 1,2 ** page 5; example 3 * |