EP1154731 - CLEANING ELEMENT, ESPECIALLY FOR CLEANING TEETH AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORONET-WERKE GmbH Neustadt 2 69483 Wald-Michelbach / DE | [2001/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIHRAUCH, Georg Am Rossert 1 D-69483 Wald-Michelbach / DE | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Lasch, Hartmut LICHTI - Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | Lasch, Hartmut Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys.Dr. rer. nat Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 00906339.7 | 17.02.2000 | [2001/47] | WO2000EP01295 | Priority number, date | DE1999108238 | 25.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19908238 | [2001/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0049965 | Date: | 31.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1154731 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1154731 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61C15/04 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
A61C15/042 (EP,US);
A61C15/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/38] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSELEMENT, INSBESONDERE ZUR REINIGUNG VON ZÄHNEN UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2001/47] | English: | CLEANING ELEMENT, ESPECIALLY FOR CLEANING TEETH AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2001/47] | French: | ELEMENT DE NETTOYAGE, EN PARTICULIER POUR LE NETTOYAGE DES DENTS, ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2001/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 15.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 15.09.2004 | DK | 15.12.2004 | GR | 15.12.2004 | PT | 15.02.2005 | AT | 17.02.2005 | CY | 17.02.2005 | IE | 17.02.2005 | LU | 17.02.2005 | SE | 18.02.2005 | BE | 28.02.2005 | CH | 28.02.2005 | LI | 28.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
AT | 17.02.2005 | ||
CY | 17.02.2005 | ||
IE | 17.02.2005 | ||
LU | 17.02.2005 | ||
SE | 18.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
AT | 17.02.2005 | ||
IE | 17.02.2005 | ||
LU | 17.02.2005 | ||
SE | 18.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
AT | 17.02.2005 | ||
IE | 17.02.2005 | ||
SE | 18.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 17.02.2005 | ||
SE | 18.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 18.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 18.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 18.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 15.09.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3942539 (CORLISS JOSEPH J, et al) [X] 1,2,4,10,11 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 2; figures 1-10; claim 1 * [A] 23; | [Y]US4550741 (KRAG MARK D [US]) [Y] 17 * column 4, line 29 - line 33; figures 11,12 *; | [X]US4974615 (DOUNDOULAKIS GEORGE J [US]) [X] 1-4,6,10,13 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 40; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US5086792 (CHODOROW INGRAM S [US]) [Y] 16 * column 2, line 20 - line 24; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5289836 (PENG CHIEN-LUN [TW]) [A] 5,20-22* column 2, line 46 - line 59; figures 1,2,6A; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5316028 (FLEMMING PATRICIA S [US]) [A] 3,18 * column 2, line 32 - line 39; figure 3 *; | [XY]US5433226 (BURCH ROBERT R [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8,10-15 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 6 * * column 8, line 19 - line 56 * * column 9, line 37 - line 39 * * figures 4-6 * [Y] 16,17; | [X]WO9806350 (GILLETTE CANADA [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4,12,13 * page 4, line 15 - line 17; figures 3A-4F * * page 8, line 26 - line 31 * * page 10, line 6 - line 10 *; | [X]US5775346 (SZYSZKOWSKI ANDREW J [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,9,19 * column 7, line 16 - line 67; figures 1-11 * |