EP1169185 - WHEEL SUSPENSION FOR DRIVEN REAR WHEELS OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Dr. Ing. H.C.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUNERT, Reinhard Kirchbergstrasse 56 D-71287 Weissach / DE | [2002/02] | Application number, filing date | 00906369.4 | 22.02.2000 | [2002/02] | WO2000EP01435 | Priority number, date | DE1999109937 | 06.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19909937 | DE2000105407 | 08.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10005407 | [2002/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0053440 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1169185 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1169185 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60G3/26, B60G3/20 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
B60G3/26 (EP,US);
B60G3/20 (EP,US);
B60G2200/18 (EP,US);
B60G2200/184 (EP,US);
B60G2200/462 (EP,US);
B60G2204/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/02] | Title | German: | RADAUFHÄNGUNG FÜR ANGETRIEBENE HINTERRÄDER EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES | [2002/02] | English: | WHEEL SUSPENSION FOR DRIVEN REAR WHEELS OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2002/02] | French: | SUSPENSION POUR ROUES ARRIERE MOTRICES D'UN VEHICULE A MOTEUR | [2002/02] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 26.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.06.2003 | FI | 11.06.2003 | IE | 11.06.2003 | DK | 11.09.2003 | GR | 11.09.2003 | PT | 11.09.2003 | ES | 22.09.2003 | LU | 22.02.2004 | BE | 28.02.2004 | MC | 28.02.2004 | CH | 29.02.2004 | LI | 29.02.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/23] | FI | 11.06.2003 | |
IE | 11.06.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
LU | 22.02.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
CH | 29.02.2004 | ||
LI | 29.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | FI | 11.06.2003 | |
IE | 11.06.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
BE | 28.02.2004 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
CH | 29.02.2004 | ||
LI | 29.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 11.06.2003 | |
IE | 11.06.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
MC | 28.02.2004 | ||
CH | 29.02.2004 | ||
LI | 29.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | FI | 11.06.2003 | |
IE | 11.06.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
CH | 29.02.2004 | ||
LI | 29.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 11.06.2003 | |
IE | 11.06.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | FI | 11.06.2003 | |
IE | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 11.06.2003 | |
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | GR | 11.09.2003 | |
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 11.09.2003 | |
PT | 11.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE1938850 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG); | [A]GB1285047 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP0239449 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 10 * figure 2 *; | [A]US4744586 (SHIBAHATA YASUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7,9,13,16 * figure - *; | [A]US4991867 (WASHIZU SHOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,5 *; | [X]WO9216386 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [X] 1-8,13-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0655355 (PORSCHE AG [DE]); | [A] - BERKEFELD V ET AL, "DIE LSA-HINTERRADAUFHANGUNG DES NEUEN PORSCHE 911 CARRERA", ATZ AUTOMOBILTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT,DE,FRANCKH'SCHE VERLAGSHANDLUNG. STUTTGART, (19940601), vol. 96, no. 6, ISSN 0001-2785, pages 340 - 342,344-34, XP000448786 | by applicant | DE1938850 | DE3714034 | - US-REPORT ON THE SIXTH INTERNATIONAL TECHNICAL CONFERENCE ON EXPERIMENTAL SAFETY VEHICLES, (19761012), pages 656 - 664 |