EP1155341 - TWO-DIMENSIONAL DETECTOR OF IONISING RADIATION AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2006/44] |
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75752 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERSTENMAYER, Jean-Louis 35bis, rue des Trois Fermes F-91400 Orsay / FR | 02 /
MAITREJEAN, Serge 202, boulevard de Charonne F-75020 Paris / FR | 03 /
HENNION, Claude 12, rue de la Glacière F-75013 Paris / FR | 04 /
DORION, Irène 19, rue des Lombards F-75014 Paris / FR | 05 /
DESAUTE, Pascal 1, Place Emile Landrin F-75020 Paris / FR | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Audier, Philippe André, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Audier, Philippe André, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/47] | Audier, Philippe André, et al Brevatome, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00906461.9 | 23.02.2000 | [2001/47] | WO2000FR00448 | Priority number, date | FR19990002289 | 24.02.1999 Original published format: FR 9902289 | [2001/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0050922 | Date: | 31.08.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1155341 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/185, G01T1/29 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
G01T1/2935 (EP,US);
G01T1/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ZWEI DIMENSIONALER DETEKTOR FÜR IONISIERENDE STRAHLUNG AND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2001/47] | English: | TWO-DIMENSIONAL DETECTOR OF IONISING RADIATION AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME | [2001/47] | French: | DETECTEUR BIDIMENSIONNEL DE RAYONNEMENTS IONISANTS ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CE DETECTEUR | [2001/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 17.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/10] | 20.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/10] | Request for further processing for: | 05.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 05.12.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.12.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4150315 (YANG KEI-HSIUNG) [A] 1,2,4-7 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 3; figures 1,1A *; | [A]EP0678896 (CHARPAK GEORGES [FR]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 49 - column 11, line 20; figure 3 *; | [AD] - GERSTENMAYER J -L, "High DQE performance X-and gamma-ray fast imagers: emergent concepts", NINTH SYMPOSIUM ON RADIATION MEASUREMENTS AND APPLICATIONS, ANN ARBOR, MI, USA, 11-14 MAY 1998, Nuclear Instruments & Methods in Physics Research, Section A (Accelerators, Spectrometers, Detectors and Associated Equipment), 11 Feb. 1999, Elsevier, Netherlands, vol. 422, no. 1-3, ISSN 0168-9002, pages 649 - 655, XP002122999 [AD] 1,8,9 * page 652, column 1, line 16 - column 2, line 34; figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9002(98)01011-0 | [AD] - JEAVONS A P ET AL, "HIGH-DENSITY MULTIWIRE DRIFT CHAMBER", NUCL INSTRUM METHODS MAR 1 1975, (19750301), vol. 124, no. 2, pages 491 - 503, XP002123000 [AD] 1,10 * page 492, column 1, line 5 - page 493, column 1, line 19; figure 1 * * page 494, column 1, line 16 - line 24 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0029-554X(75)90601-1 | [A] - SUZUKI M ET AL, "ON THE OPTICAL READOUT OF GAS AVALANCHE CHAMBERS AND ITS APPLICATIONS", FRONT DETECT FOR FRONT PHYS, PROC OF THE THIRD PISA MEET ON ADV DETECT, CASTIGLIONE;DELLA PESCAIA, ITALY JUN 3-7 1986, Nucl Instrum Methods Phys Res Jan 1 1986, (19860101), vol. A263, no. 1, pages 237 - 242, XP002123032 [A] 15 * page 239, column 1, line 3 - line 8 * |