EP1167595 - MULTIFILAMENT FOR MOHAIR-LIKE PILE FABRIC AND PILE FABRIC COMPRISING THE SAME AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE FABRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATOBA, Satoshi 1208-61, Nishihama, Kitahamacho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 671-0123 / JP | 02 /
KASHITA, Yoshinori 1-13-2-303, Nishihata Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676-0025 / JP | 03 /
NOGUCHI, Hideo 2433-18, Sonecho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676-0082 / JP | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/01] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00906649.9 | 03.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000JP01252 | Priority number, date | JP19990056376 | 04.03.1999 Original published format: JP 5637699 | JP19990056377 | 04.03.1999 Original published format: JP 5637799 | [2002/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0052241 | Date: | 08.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1167595 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D02G3/22, D04B1/02 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
D04B1/16 (EP);
D02G3/22 (EP,KR);
D04B1/04 (EP);
D04B21/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | MULTIFILAMENTGARN FÜR MOHAIR-ÄHNLICHES FLORGEWEBE UND EIN SOLCHES GARN BEINHALTENTES GEWEBE, UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES GEWEBES | [2002/01] | English: | MULTIFILAMENT FOR MOHAIR-LIKE PILE FABRIC AND PILE FABRIC COMPRISING THE SAME AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE FABRIC | [2002/01] | French: | MULTIFILAMENT DESTINE A UN TISSU A POILS DU TYPE MOHAIR, TISSU A POILS COMPRENANT CE MULTIFILAMENT, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CE TISSU | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2001 | Translation filed | 04.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 23.02.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS546962 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [Y]JPS59192727 (NIPPON ESTER CO LTD); | [Y]JPS63190083 (KURARAY CO); | [A]DE2351928 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND) |