EP1257638 - BACTERIAL ISOLATES OF THE GENUS KLEBSIELLA, AND AN ISOMALTULOSE SYNTHASE GENE ISOLATED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agency for Science, Technology and Research 20 Biopolis Way, No. 07-01 Centros Singapore 138668 / SG | [2007/31] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Agency for Science, Technology and Research 20 Biopolis Way, No. 07-01 Centros Singapore 138668 / SG | ||
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states Institute of Molecular Agrobiology 1 Research Link, The National University of Singapore Singapore 117604 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Lian, Hui 360 Pasir Panjang Road,03-11 Goldcoast Condo. Singapore 118699 / SG | 02 /
LI, Xianzhen 16 West Coa.Crescent,03-11 Tower 1a Westcove Con. Singapore 12844 / SG | 03 /
ZHANG, Daohai Blk 709 Clementi West Street 2 08-281 Singapore 120709 / SG | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Marchant, James Ian, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00906861.0 | 15.02.2000 | [2002/47] | WO2000SG00023 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0160993 | Date: | 23.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1257638 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1257638 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/90, C12N15/00 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
C12N9/90 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12P19/12 (EP,US);
C12P19/24 (EP,US);
C12Y504/99011 (EP,US);
C12R2001/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/47] | Title | German: | BAKTERIELLE STÄMME VON GENUS KLEBSIELLA UND DEREN GEN KODIEREND FÜR ISOMALTULOSE SYNTHASE | [2002/47] | English: | BACTERIAL ISOLATES OF THE GENUS KLEBSIELLA, AND AN ISOMALTULOSE SYNTHASE GENE ISOLATED THEREFROM | [2002/47] | French: | ISOLATS BACTERIENS DU GENRE KLEBSIELLA ET GENE D'ISOMALTULOSE SYNTHASE ISOLE A PARTIR DE CES DERNIERS | [2002/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 09.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 09.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.08.2007 | BE | 01.08.2007 | CH | 01.08.2007 | CY | 01.08.2007 | DK | 01.08.2007 | FI | 01.08.2007 | LI | 01.08.2007 | NL | 01.08.2007 | SE | 01.11.2007 | GR | 02.11.2007 | ES | 12.11.2007 | PT | 02.01.2008 | IE | 15.02.2008 | LU | 15.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | IT | 29.02.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 15.02.2008 | ||
LU | 15.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 15.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 15.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 01.08.2007 | |
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 01.08.2007 | |
ES | 12.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 12.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9520047 (SUEDZUCKER AG [DE], et al) [X] 3-20 * abstract * * page 6 - page 9 * * page 52 - page 54 * * claim 17 *; | [A]US5985668 (MATTES RALF [DE], et al) [A] 3-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 66 - column 4, line 61 *; | [A] - TSUYUKI KEN'ICHIRO ET AL, "Isolation and characterization of isomaltulose- and trehalulose-producing bacteria from Thailand soil.", JOURNAL OF GENERAL AND APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 38, no. 5, ISSN 0022-1260, pages 483 - 490, XP000972117 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | [A] - HUANG J -H ET AL, "Conversion of sucrose to isomaltulose by Klebsiella planticola CCRC 19112.", JOURNAL OF INDUSTRIAL MICROBIOLOGY & BIOTECHNOLOGY, (199807), vol. 21, no. 1-2, ISSN 1367-5435, pages 22 - 27, XP000972169 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.jim.2900552 | [A] - PARK Y K ET AL, "CONVERSION OF SUCROSE TO ISOMALTULOSE BY MICROBIAL GLUCOSYLTRANSFERASE", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (1992), vol. 14, no. 7, ISSN 0141-5492, pages 547 - 551, XP000972152 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01023938 | Examination | - MASLOW ET AL, "Relationship between indole production and differentiation of Klebsiella species: Indole-positive and -negative isolates of Klebsiella determined to be clonal", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (200308), vol. 31, no. 8, pages 2000 - 2003 |