EP1070196 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ENHANCING REMOTE SENSOR PERFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road, Bldg. T 3rd Floor San Ramon, CA 94583-2324 / US | For all designated states SENSOR DYNAMICS LIMITED 3 Abbas Business Centre, Itchen Abbas Winchester, Hampshire SO21 1BQ / GB | [2006/22] |
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road, Bldg. T 3rd Floor San Ramon, CA 94583-2324 / US | ||
For all designated states SENSOR DYNAMICS LIMITED 3 Abbas Business Centre, Itchen Abbas Winchester, Hampshire SO21 1BQ / GB | |||
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. Third Floor, 2613 Camino Ramon San Ramon, CA 94583-4289 / US | ||
For all designated states SENSOR DYNAMICS LIMITED 3 Abbas Business Centre, Itchen Abbas Winchester, Hampshire SO21 1BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLUTH, E. L. E. The Town Mill, Mill Hill Alresford, Hampshire SO24 9DD / GB | 02 /
VARNHAM, M. P. 76 Grange Road, Alresford Hampshire SO24 9HF / GB | 03 /
CLOWES, J. R. Flat 2, Bell House, Headley Close Alresford, Hampshire SO24 9PA / GB | 04 /
CRAWLEY, C., M. 18 Silver Birch Lane Danville, CA 94506 / US | 05 /
KUTLIK, Roy 5969 Westover Drive Oakland, CA 94611 / US | [2001/04] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00907123.4 | 02.02.2000 | [2001/04] | WO2000US02748 | Priority number, date | GB19990002596 | 05.02.1999 Original published format: GB 9902596 | [2001/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0046485 | Date: | 10.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1070196 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1070196 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/01, E21B47/06, E21B23/08 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
E21B47/06 (EP);
E21B47/017 (EP,US);
E21B23/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER LEISTUNG EINES FERNSENSORS | [2001/04] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ENHANCING REMOTE SENSOR PERFORMANCE | [2001/04] | French: | ACCROISSEMENT DU RENDEMENT ET DE L'UTILITE D'UNE SONDE A DISTANCE | [2001/04] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 25.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.05.2006 | BE | 31.05.2006 | CH | 31.05.2006 | CY | 31.05.2006 | FI | 31.05.2006 | FR | 31.05.2006 | IT | 31.05.2006 | LI | 31.05.2006 | NL | 31.05.2006 | DK | 31.08.2006 | SE | 31.08.2006 | DE | 01.09.2006 | GR | 01.09.2006 | ES | 11.09.2006 | PT | 31.10.2006 | IE | 02.02.2007 | LU | 02.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/01] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
FR | 31.05.2006 | ||
IT | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
DE | 01.09.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
IE | 02.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IT | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
DE | 01.09.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
IE | 02.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IT | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
DE | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
IE | 02.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IT | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
DE | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IT | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
DE | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
IT | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
BE | 31.05.2006 | ||
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
CH | 31.05.2006 | ||
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
LI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 31.05.2006 | |
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 31.08.2006 | |
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 31.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0695853 (HALLIBURTON CO [US]) [X] 9,19,20 * column 1, line 7 - line 11 * * abstract *; | [A]US5570437 (KLUTH ERHARD L E [GB], et al) [A] 2,8,16,19 * abstract *; | [A]US5582064 (KLUTH ERHARD L [GB]) [A] 2,8,16,19* abstract *; | [Y]GB2305724 (SENSOR DYNAMICS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,14 * page 11, paragraph 3 - page 16, paragraph 1; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]EP0774565 (SMEDVIG TECHNOLOGY AS [NO]) [Y] 1,14 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 15; figures 2,4 *; | [A]GB2311546 (SENSOR DYNAMICS LTD [GB]) [A] 2,8,16,19 * abstract *; | [A]US5804713 (KLUTH ERHARD LOTHAR [GB]) [A] 2,8,16,19 * abstract * |